Caffey v. Stephenson
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Webber Wright |
Referred: | Beth Deere |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00100 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 02, 2017 |
Defendant
Randall Stephenson
|
|
Plaintiff
Eric L Caffey
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
Appellate Filing Fee Notice
Fri 06/02 4:40 PM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (mef) |
|
14 | 14
order
Judgment 1983
Fri 06/02 4:16 PM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with the13 Order entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is administratively terminated. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/2/2017. (mef) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations
Fri 06/02 4:12 PM
ORDER approving and adopting the11 Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects. The Court abstains from proceeding with Mr. Caffey's federal case. The Clerk is directed to administratively terminate this case. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/2/2017. (mef) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Wed 05/31 11:10 AM
OBJECTION to11 Recommended Disposition by Eric L Caffey. (ljb) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Report and Recommendations
Mon 05/08 12:11 PM
RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that the Court abstain from proceeding with Mr. Caffey's federal case and that the case be administratively terminated. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/8/2017. (ljb) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 04/25 1:33 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Randall Stephenson, filed by Eric L Caffey.(kdr) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 03/31 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Eric L Caffey. (jak) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 03/31 1:04 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Eric L Caffey re6 Order and7 Order. (mef) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order
Tue 03/21 10:09 AM
ORDER. Mr. Caffey has 30 days to file an amended complaint. Failure to comply with this Court's order could result in the dismissal of his claims, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/21/2017. (mef) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 03/21 10:02 AM
ORDER granting5 motion to proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk of Court to send a copy of this Order to the Inmate Finance Supervisor of the Pulaski County Detention Facility. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/21/2017. (mef) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/06 1:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric L Caffey. (ljb) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 02/27 11:41 AM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS denying without prejudice the1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Clerk to enclose an IFP application along with a copy of this order; and directing plaintiff to either pay the $400.00 filing fee or return a completed IFP application within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/27/2017. (ljb) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 02/22 3:26 PM
ORDER OF REFERRAL. The case is referred to Magistrate Judge Beth Deere for further proceedings and recommendation. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/22/2017. (mef) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/17 2:46 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Randall Stephenson filed by Eric L Caffey.(mef) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 02/17 2:45 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eric L Caffey. (mef) |