QBE Specialty Insurance Company v. Mid-West Trading Co.
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen Gren Scholer |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00457 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance) |
Case Filed: | Feb 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 15, 2017 4:12 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
Mid-West Trading Co.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
QBE Specialty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mid-West Trading Co.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
QBE Specialty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
misc
Stipulation
Wed 03/28 4:12 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice by QBE Specialty Insurance Company. (Ferguson, Carter) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Public Entry)
Thu 03/29 8:29 AM
Civil Case Terminated per44 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. (ran) |
||
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 03/21 10:23 AM
ORAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE in supplement to Special Order 3-318 that transferred cases listed on Exhibit A to Judge Scholer. Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Judge A. Joe Fish no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 3/21/2018) (lrl) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Supplemental Document
Wed 03/07 9:20 AM
Supplemental Document by QBE Specialty Insurance Company as to41 Appendix in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment . (Ferguson, Carter) |
|
Monday, March 05, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
respm
Appendix in Support
Mon 03/05 9:17 PM
Appendix in Support filed by QBE Specialty Insurance Company re40 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Ferguson, Carter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) | ||
40 | 40
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Mon 03/05 9:15 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by QBE Specialty Insurance Company re39 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Ferguson, Carter) |
|
39 | 39
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 03/05 9:14 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by QBE Specialty Insurance Company (Ferguson, Carter) |
|
Sunday, March 04, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
respm
Appendix in Support
Sun 03/04 2:23 PM
Appendix in Support filed by QBE Specialty Insurance Company re37 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement (Ferguson, Carter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) | ||
37 | 37
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Sun 03/04 2:20 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by QBE Specialty Insurance Company re36 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement (Ferguson, Carter) |
|
36 | 36
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Sun 03/04 2:12 PM
MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by QBE Specialty Insurance Company (Ferguson, Carter) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 01/17 4:13 PM
ORDER: The court's34 order dated 1/16/2018 is hereby VACATED. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 1/17/2018) (epm) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 01/16 4:45 PM
ORDER: The parties having advised the court that this case has been settled, it is ORDERED that the final judgment or order of dismissal be presented for entry by January 24, 2018. If it is not, then the case will be subject to dismissal. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 1/16/2018) (chmb) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 12/13 4:11 PM
Return of Service for Subpoena served on Lewis O'Leary on 11/25/2017. (sss) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
adr
ADR Summary
Mon 12/11 3:36 PM
Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by ADR Provider. Attorneys in Attendance: Carther Ferguson, Laura Docker, Aamer Ravji, Christopher Jaynes. Prv Fee: $ 2550.00. Outcome of ADR: Settled as a result of ADR. (Prevost, J) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 12/05 3:23 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is RESET for trial on the court's four-weekdocket beginning 6/4/2018 before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. Motions due by 3/5/2018. Discovery due by 3/31/2018. Pretrial Order due by 5/25/2018. Pretrial Materials due by 5/25/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2018 10:00 AM before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 12/5/2017) (epm) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Continue
Mon 12/04 3:38 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Setting and Amend Scheduling Order filed by QBE Specialty Insurance Company (Docker, Laura) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Amended Document
Wed 11/22 12:13 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Mid-West Trading Co. Amendment to28 Designation of Experts. Corrected Certificate of Service . (Jaynes, Christopher) |
|
28 | 28
trial
Designation of Experts
Wed 11/22 10:58 AM
Designation of Experts by Mid-West Trading Co. (Jaynes, Christopher) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 11/20 9:10 AM
ORDER granting26 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Jaynes. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 11/17/2017) (ykp) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 11/17 3:33 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8812373) filed by Mid-West Trading Co (Jaynes, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
trial
Designation of Experts
Fri 10/27 3:40 PM
Designation of Experts by QBE Specialty Insurance Company. (Ferguson, Carter) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Wed 10/11 2:14 PM
ORDER: The parties' joint motion to extend dispositive motion deadline is GRANTED as follows: All motions that would dispose of all or any part of this case (including motions for summary judgment) are EXTENDED to 12/5/2017. No further extensions will be granted. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 10/11/2017) (sss) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 10/10 5:18 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time Dispositive motion deadline filed by Mid-West Trading Co (Brewer, William) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation
Fri 10/06 3:32 PM
Joint STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Deadlines for Expert Witness by QBE Specialty Insurance Company. (Ferguson, Carter) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
3
pgs
order
Order For ADR
Wed 10/04 2:51 PM
MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints J Neal Prevost as mediator.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 10/4/2017) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Status Report
Mon 10/02 4:13 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by QBE Specialty Insurance Company. (Docker, Laura) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 04/25 5:01 PM
ORDER ESTABLISHING SCHEDULE AND CERTAIN PRETRIAL REQUIREMENTS: If the parties do not report by 10/2/2017 that this case has been settled, it will be ordered to mandatory but non-binding mediation. This case is set for trial on this court's four-week docket beginning 3/5/2018 before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. Joinder of Parties due by 4/26/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 4/26/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 10/26/2017. Discovery due by 12/31/2017. Pretrial Order due by 2/23/2018. Pretrial Materials due by 2/23/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2018 at 10:00 AM before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/25/2017) (twd) |
|
Att: 1 Consent form | ||
18 | 18
misc
Status Report
Tue 04/25 2:58 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by QBE Specialty Insurance Company. (Ferguson, Carter) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Fri 04/21 11:44 AM
ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by QBE Specialty Insurance Company. Related document:12 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, (Ferguson, Carter) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 04/05 1:25 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Collins on behalf of Mid-West Trading Co.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Collins, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Status Report Order
Tue 04/04 10:30 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 4/25/2017. See order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/4/2017) (chmb) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order
Tue 04/04 10:27 AM
ORDER: Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, within twenty days of this date, the defendant shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so will subject the defendant to the entry of default judgment without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/4/2017) (chmb) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/03 11:54 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mid-West Trading Co.. (Brewer, William) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Mon 04/03 11:25 PM
Mid-West Trading's ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Mid-West Trading Co.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against QBE Specialty Insurance Company filed by Mid-West Trading Co.Attorney William A Brewer, III added to party Mid-West Trading Co.(pty:dft) (Brewer, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Policy | ||
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Fri 03/10 4:32 PM
ORDER: The parties' agreed motion for extension of time to respond to complaint (docket entry10 ) is GRANTED. Defendant shall electronically file its answer no later than 4/3/2017. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 3/10/2017) (sss) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 03/10 2:05 PM
Agreed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by QBE Specialty Insurance Company (Ferguson, Carter) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Agreed Motion for Extension | ||
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned
Tue 02/21 5:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Mid-West Trading Co; served on 2/20/2017. (twd) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Fri 02/17 2:22 PM
Summons Issued as to Mid-West Trading Co. (ykp) |
|
7 | 7
qcref
Fish
Fri 02/17 2:16 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Request for Clerk to Issue Document
Fri 02/17 1:49 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons filed by QBE Specialty Insurance Company. (Ferguson, Carter) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order Transferring to Another Division
Fri 02/17 9:35 AM
Order Transferring Case. It is ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to the Dallas division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost on 2/17/2017) (jak) |
|
utility
Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer
Fri 02/17 12:03 PM
New case number 3:17-cv-00457-G QBE Specialty Insurance Company v. Mid-West Trading Co. has been opened following the order of transfer entered in case number 1:17cv0022 BL. Future filings should be made in the DALLAS division and reflect the new case number as indicated. Clerk to complete new case processing and mail notice of this entry to any party who did not receive it electronically. (ldm) |
||
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by QBE Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate QBE Insurance Group Limited for QBE Specialty Insurance Company. (Ferguson, Carter) | |
3 | 3 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff QBE Specialty Insurance Company. (Ferguson, Carter) | |
2 | 2 ORDER And Notice Of Option To Consent To Proceed Before The Magistrate Judge. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost on 2/16/2017) (jak) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Mid-West Trading Co. filed by QBE Specialty Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8215850) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ferguson, Carter) | |
Att: 1 Cover Sheet | ||
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. (jak) |