Simmons v. Home Depot USA Inc
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam A Lindsay |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00463 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 16, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 16, 2017 4:57 AM CDT |
Defendant
Home Depot USA Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Derek Simmons
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Fri 02/16 4:40 PM
ORDER: Before the court is the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of All Claims, filed 2/16/2018. The court determines that this case should be dismissed. Accordingly, all claims of Plaintiff Derek Simmons in this action against Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. The parties shall bear their own costs. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 2/16/2018) (axm) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation
Fri 02/16 2:31 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL of All Claims by Home Depot USA Inc. (Smith, Arthur) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Public Entry)
Fri 02/16 3:06 PM
Civil Case Terminated per22 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. (ykp) |
||
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Appendix in Support
Tue 01/02 11:27 AM
Appendix in Support filed by Home Depot USA Inc re20 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Smith, Arthur) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A and B | ||
20 | 20
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Tue 01/02 11:25 AM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Home Depot USA Inc re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Smith, Arthur) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 01/02 11:22 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Home Depot USA Inc (Smith, Arthur) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
8
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Thu 12/28 11:35 AM
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER OF CONFIDENTIALITY granting17 Motion for Protective Order (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 12/28/2017) (svc) |
|
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Protective Order
Wed 12/27 2:17 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order filed by Home Depot USA Inc (Smith, Arthur) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Supplemental Document
Mon 11/06 4:45 PM
Supplemental Document by Home Depot USA Inc Rule 26(a)(2)(C) Expert Disclosures . (Smith, Arthur) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 08/22 4:50 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Arthur K Smith for Felicia A. Norvell on behalf of Home Depot USA Inc. (Smith, Arthur) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation
Mon 07/17 2:55 PM
Agreed STIPULATION by Derek Simmons. (Lidji, I) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Settlement Conference Report
Mon 07/17 2:51 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REPORT filed by Derek Simmons. (Lidji, I) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 06/22 2:53 PM
ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint,, filed by Home Depot USA Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Smith, Arthur) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 06/15 2:44 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Home Depot USA Inc filed by Derek Simmons. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ndt) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Thu 06/15 2:16 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting9 Motion for Leave to File. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/15/2017) (chmb) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Leave to File
Thu 05/25 11:42 AM
First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Derek Simmons (Lidji, I) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Amendment | ||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order For ADR
Wed 04/19 10:46 AM
MEDIATION ORDER. The parties are to select or designate a mediator.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 1/5/2018. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/19/2017) (epm) |
|
7 | 7
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 04/19 10:42 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this court's four-week docket beginning 5/7/2018 before Judge Sam A Lindsay. Joinder of Parties due by 6/26/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 7/18/2017. Motions due by 1/19/2018. Discovery due by 1/5/2018. Pretrial Order due by 4/9/2018. Pretrial Materials due by 4/9/2018. Status Report due by 7/18/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2018 10:00 AM before Judge Sam A Lindsay. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/19/2017) (epm) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Status Report
Tue 04/18 3:12 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT with Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Home Depot USA Inc. (Smith, Arthur) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Status Report Order
Fri 03/17 10:53 AM
ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND STATUS REPORT: Status Report due by 4/18/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 3/17/2017) (epm) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 02/22 3:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Derek Simmons. (Lidji, I) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 02/22 2:57 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Home Depot USA Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot USA Inc. (Smith, Arthur) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
qcref
Lindsay
Fri 02/17 5:02 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 02/17 2:34 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 44th District Court, Dallas County, case number DC 16-13464 filed by Home Depot USA Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8219175) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Smith, Arthur) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B-2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B-3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B-4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit B-5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit B-6, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit B-7, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit B-8, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit B-9, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit B-10, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit B-11, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit B-12, | ||
Att: 14 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 15 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet |