Robledo v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane J Boyle |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00464 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 30, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 16, 2017 4:44 AM CDT |
Defendant
Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
New Penn Financial LLC
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
ADR Provider
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martin Robledo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion for New Trial Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 05/10 9:58 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot12 Motion for New Trial and13 Motion to Enforce Settlement in light of24 the parties' Joint Notice of Resolution. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/10/2018) (chmb) |
|
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 05/09 9:59 AM
NOTICE of Resolution re:12 MOTION for New Trial ,13 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement,11 Stipulation filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Carlson, Alysia) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order
Tue 05/08 11:35 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER VACATING the hearing set for May 8, 2018 in light of the parties' settlement. The Court ORDERS the parties to submit their final settlement papers by May 11, 2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/8/2018) (chmb) |
|
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Hearing
Wed 03/28 10:57 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting21 the parties' Joint Motion to Set Hearing. The Court hereby ORDERS a hearing to be held on May 8, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. The parties are directed to call the Court at least (2) two days prior to the hearing to confirm that they are aware of the setting and will attend. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/28/2018) (chmb) Modified on 3/28/2018 to add time of hearing (zkc) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Hearing
Tue 03/27 2:39 PM
Joint MOTION for Hearing re12 MOTION for New Trial ,13 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement,17 MOTION enforcement of settlement agreement denied and motion for new trial denied re12 MOTION for New Trial ,13 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement,14 Response/Objection,18 Reply,14 Response/Objection filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, New Penn Financial LLC (Carlson, Alysia) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 01/24 11:09 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Karen Elizabeth Ferris. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/24/2018) (chmb) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 11/14 2:12 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Karen E. Ferris. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 11/14/2017) (chmb) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Reply
Mon 11/13 3:16 PM
REPLY filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, New Penn Financial LLC re:13 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement,17 MOTION enforcement of settlement agreement denied and motion for new trial denied re12 MOTION for New Trial ,13 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement,14 Response/Objection (Townsend, C) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 10/30 11:58 PM
MOTION enforcement of settlement agreement denied and motion for new trial denied re12 MOTION for New Trial ,13 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement,14 Response/Objection filed by Martin Robledo with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Ferris, Karen) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 10/20 11:51 AM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8752759) filed by Martin Robledo (Ferris, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 10/19 5:16 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice without Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8751434) filed by Martin Robledo (Ferris, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Response/Objection
Fri 10/13 4:47 PM
RESPONSE filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, New Penn Financial LLC re:12 MOTION for New Trial (Townsend, C) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 10/13 4:46 PM
MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, New Penn Financial LLC (Townsend, C) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2 | ||
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
New Trial
Fri 09/29 11:12 PM
MOTION for New Trial filed by Martin Robledo Attorney Karen Elizabeth Ferris added to party Martin Robledo(pty:pla) (Ferris, Karen) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation
Wed 08/30 3:35 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, New Penn Financial LLC. (Carlson, Alysia) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 08/30 4:43 PM
Civil Case Terminated per11 Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. (ndt) |
||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order For ADR
Wed 04/19 9:36 AM
MEDIATION ORDER. The Court has selected Gary Berman as the parties' mediator.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 9/1/2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/19/2017) (twd) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 04/18 4:54 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Alysia Nicole Carlson on behalf of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, New Penn Financial LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Carlson, Alysia) |
|
8 | 8
adr
Designation of Mediator
Tue 04/18 10:04 AM
Designation of Mediator by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Carlson, Alysia) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer
Fri 04/14 9:57 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE:By 4/21/17, both parties must SHOW CAUSE, in writing, why they have not yet designated a mediator. Failure to show cause or file the appropriate documents may result in sanctions. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/14/2017) (ash) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 03/08 11:11 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning 1/29/2018 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 5/4/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 5/4/2017. Deadline for mediation is on or before 9/1/2017. Discovery due by 10/2/2017. Motions due by 10/31/2017. Pretrial Order due by 1/16/2018. Pretrial Materials due by 1/16/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2018 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/8/2017) (ndt) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Status Report
Tue 03/07 2:56 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Carlson, Alysia) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Status Report Order
Tue 02/21 3:45 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 3/13/2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 2/21/2017) (aaa) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 02/17 4:16 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, New Penn Financial LLC. (Townsend, C) |
|
2 | 2
qcref
Boyle
Fri 02/17 4:16 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (twd) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 02/17 3:47 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 95th Judicial District, Dallas County, case number DC 17-00668 filed by New Penn Financial, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8219664) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Townsend, C) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits Index, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 1- Original Petition, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 2- Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) 3- Requests for Citations, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) 4- Defendants' Original Answer, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) 5- Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) 6- Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet |