Cox v. Berryhill
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Rebecca Rutherford |
Referred: | Paul D Stickney |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00466 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Judgment
Thu 03/29 4:14 PM
JUDGMENT: The Court has entered its Memorandum Opinion and Order affirming the final decision of the Commissioner. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this case is dismissed with prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 3/28/2018) (ndt) |
|
25 | 25
10
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion and Order
Thu 03/29 4:12 PM
Memorandum Opinion and Order: Plaintiff Kenneth Bernard Cox brings this action for judicial review of the Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration's ("Commissioner") final decision denying his claim for supplemental security income under Title XVI of the Social Security Act, pursuant to Title 42, United States Code, Section 405(g). For the following reasons, the final decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 3/28/2018) (ndt) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 02/16 12:19 PM
Notice of parties' consent(s) to proceed before the magistrate judge filed by Nancy A Berryhill, Kenneth Bernard Cox. (cea) |
|
Att: 1 Consent | ||
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability or Consent
Tue 01/30 12:37 PM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction. The parties are required to complete and return the enclosed form to the clerk by 2/13/2018. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 1/30/2018) (sss) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Mon 01/29 9:37 AM
Special Order 3-316: Effective 1/26/18 all civil cases assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul D. Stickney are reassigned to Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford and shall henceforth carry the suffix letters "BT." Magistrate Judge Rutherford shall seek consent of the parties in these cases to conduct all further proceedings and order the entry of final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 636(c).If all parties do not consent, Magistrate Judge Rutherford shall, unless the assigned district judge otherwise orders, exercise all powers permitted by 28 U.S.C. § 636(b). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 1/26/2018) (lrl) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Thu 06/01 7:29 AM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Nancy A Berryhill re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Simonson, Keith) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order
Wed 05/03 10:34 AM
ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF BRIEFS: (see order) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 5/2/2017) (mcrd) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 05/02 2:40 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kenneth Bernard Cox with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Wright, Patrick) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 05/02 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Docket Text/Document Modification. Document 18 filed on 05/02/2017 was removed from the Court's docket and will be retained by the Clerk's Office in the appropriate file. (Wright, Patrick) Modified on 5/2/2017 (cea) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order
Tue 05/02 1:50 PM
ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF BRIEFS: (see order) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 5/1/2017) (mcrd) |
|
16 | 16
order
Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability or Consent
Tue 05/02 1:47 PM
Notice of Option to Consent to Proceed Before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are required to complete and return the enclosed form to the clerk 20 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 5/1/2017) (mcrd) |
|
15 | 15
order
Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge/Order Reassigning Case
Mon 05/01 11:16 AM
ORDER: The Court having considered the consents filed by the parties is of the opinion that the above-styled and numbered civil action should be TRANSFERRED to the docket of the Honorable Paul D. Stickney, United States Magistrate Judge. This case shall hereafter be numbered Civil Action No. 3:17-CV-0466-BF. Any appeal from the judgment of the Magistrate Judge shall be to the Court of Appeals as provided by 28 U.S.C. § 636(c)(3). Senior Judge Sam R Cummings is no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 5/1/2017) (ykp) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 05/01 8:36 AM
Notice of parties' consents to proceed before the magistrate judge filed by Kenneth Bernard Cox, Nancy A Berryhill. (ctf) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Administrative Record
Thu 04/27 10:01 AM
Administrative Record consisting of Social Security record filed by Nancy A Berryhill. (Simonson, Keith) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 2 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 3 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 4 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 5 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 6 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 7 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 8 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 9 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 10 Additional Page(s) | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/27 9:42 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nancy A Berryhill. (Simonson, Keith) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/27 9:42 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, filed by Nancy A Berryhill. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Keith D Simonson added to party Nancy A Berryhill(pty:dft) (Simonson, Keith) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned
Thu 03/16 10:38 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney; served on 2/28/2017. (ykp) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned
Thu 03/16 10:32 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General; served on 3/7/2017. (ykp) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned
Thu 03/16 10:22 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nancy A Berryhill; served on 3/7/2017. (ykp) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Business Reply Card Signed
Tue 02/28 9:20 AM
Business Reply Card signed by USMS on 2/28/2017 re6 Summons,5 Order,3 Motion,2 Certificate of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement, and1 Complaint. (ran) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 02/28 8:56 AM
Summons issued as to Nancy A Berryhill, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ran) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 02/27 5:15 PM
ORDER PERMITTING PROCEEDING IN THE DISTRICT COURT AND SPECIFYING FURTHER ACTION TO BE TAKEN BY THE CLERK granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 2/27/2017) (ran) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
qcref
Cummings (Dallas)
Tue 02/21 10:31 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Stickney (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (twd) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 02/17 4:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kenneth Bernard Cox (Wright, Patrick) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 02/17 4:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kenneth Bernard Cox. (Wright, Patrick) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/17 4:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Kenneth Bernard Cox filed by Kenneth Bernard Cox. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es) for federal defendant(s). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Wright, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |