Aikens et al v. BBC Worldwide Reality Productions, LLC et al
Alaska District Court | |
Judge: | Sharon L Gleason |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00032 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 16, 2017 1:49 AM AKDT |
Defendant
BBC Worldwide Americas, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
BBC Worldwide Limited
|
|
Defendant
British Broadcasting Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Aaron Mellman
|
|
Defendant
BBC Worldwide Reality Productions, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Susan Aikens
|
Represented By
|
1. | Star of Life Below Zero files lawsuit alleging she was forced to film unsafe segments (ktuu.com) |
Submitted Wed 02/22/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 06/16 8:09 AM
ORDER . This case is DISMISSED without Prejudice for failure to prosecute as to all defendants. (BJK, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Clerk's Notice of Deficiency (Proof of Service)
Fri 05/26 8:15 AM
CLERK'S TEXT NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: Proof of service has not been filed as to defendant(s) BBC Worldwide Reality Productions, LLC; BBC Worldwide Americas, Inc.; BBC Worldwide Limited; British Broadcasting Corporation; and Aaron Mellman. Proof of service to be filed or response to this notice of deficiency as to why service has not been effected pursuant to Rule 4(m), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, is due on or before 6/9/17 or the complaint as to defendant(s) BBC Worldwide Reality Productions, LLC; BBC Worldwide Americas, Inc.; BBC Worldwide Limited; British Broadcasting Corporation; and Aaron Mellman may be dismissed. (BJK, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Unissued Summons
Mon 04/10 9:23 AM
Unissued summons re Defendant BBC Worldwide Reality Productions, LLC,(PXS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Unissued Summons re Defendant BBC Worldwide Americas, Inc., | ||
Att: 2 Unissued Summons re Defendant BBC Worldwide Limited, | ||
Att: 3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Bristish Broadcasting Corporation, | ||
Att: 4 Unissued Summons re Defendant Aaron Mellman | ||
service
1 - Summons Issued
Mon 04/10 9:57 AM
Summons Issued as to BBC Worldwide Americas, Inc., BBC Worldwide Limited, BBC Worldwide Reality Productions, LLC, British Broadcasting Corporation, Aaron Mellman. (PXS, COURT STAFF) |
||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
Fri 03/31 2:30 PM
ORDER: granting Permission for Non-Eligible Attorney to Appear and Participate3 . Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 03/31/2017. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Tue 03/07 4:11 PM
ORDER advising counsel of procedures to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss.. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 03/07/2017. (CME, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
Mon 03/06 5:49 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Robert Apgood by Susan Aikens, Susan Aikens(an Individual).(Wells, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 02/17 3:44 PM
Civil Cover Sheet (BJK, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
32
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/17 3:43 PM
COMPLAINT against BBC Woldwide Reality Productions, LLC, BBC Worldwide Americas, Inc., BBC Worldwide Limited, British Broadcasting Corporation, Aaron Mellman (Filing fee $ 400.00 Receipt 490100001), filed by Susan Aikens(an Individual), Susan Aikens.(BJK, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B |