Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-20964

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Daniel S Oppermanbaycity
Case #: 1:17-ap-02022
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2017
Terminated:Jun 16, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
James F. Ormsby
7615 S Steel Road
Saint Charles, MI 48655
Represented By
James F. Ormsby
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Himmelspach
P.O. Box 5856
Saginaw, MI 48603
Represented By
Daniel Himmelspach
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Friday, June 16, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Fri 06/16 8:06 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-2022 Closed. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
court Certificate of Mailing (generic virtual) Fri 06/16 8:08 AM
Certificate of Mailing: A Copy of this Related Document was Mailed on June 16, 2017 by the United States Postal Service to James F. Ormsby, 7615 S Steel Road, Saint Charles, MI 48655 Related [+] (Mum, J)
Related: [-] NO.26 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Thursday, June 15, 2017
26 26 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 06/16 8:05 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ADVERSARY PROCEEDING AND BARRING FURTHER LEGAL OR DMINISTRATIVE PROCEEDINGS Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] No.25 Stipulation to Dismiss
25 25 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Thu 06/15 4:40 PM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between Chapter 7 Trustee, Daniel C. Himmelspach, Defendant, James F. Ormsby and Debtor, Jodie L. Charvat . Filed by Plaintiff Daniel Himmelspach. (Himmelspach, Daniel)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry. Matter Settled Thu 06/15 3:25 PM
Minute Entry. Matter Settled - parties to submit stipulation dismissing adversary proceeding. Related [+] (we )
Related: [-] 6 Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference.
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 06/16 8:05 AM
Disposition of Adversary 1:17-ap-2022 : Dismissed by Stipulation. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2017
24 24 order order (Generic) Mon 04/17 3:20 PM
Order Regarding Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
court Certificate of Mailing (generic virtual) Mon 04/17 3:21 PM
Certificate of Mailing: A Copy of this Related Document was Mailed on April 17, 2017 by the United States Postal Service to James F. Ormsby, 7615 S Steel Road, Saint Charles, MI 48655 Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] No.24 Order
Thursday, April 13, 2017
23 23 audio . Thu 04/13 5:05 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/13/2017 3:26:58 PM ]. File Size [ 1148 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:04:47 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (BK) Fri 04/14 9:03 AM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned. Related [+] Status Conference to be held on 06/15/2017 at 03:00 PM at Courtroom, Bay City, 111 First St.. (we )
Related: [-] 6 Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference.
Wednesday, April 12, 2017
22 22 order Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel Wed 04/12 12:43 PM
Order Denying Application For Pro Bono Counsel (Docket No.21 ). (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Pro Bono Counsel Wed 04/12 10:50 AM
Application for Pro Bono Counsel Filed by Defendant James F. Ormsby (ts)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2017
20 20 answer Response Tue 04/11 3:04 PM
Response to Related [+] and Brief in Supoprt of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Daniel Himmelspach (Himmelspach, Daniel)
Related: [-] 15 Motion For Summary Judgment
Wednesday, April 05, 2017
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/06 1:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/05/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Deficiency Notice
Monday, April 03, 2017
18 18 court Deficiency Notice (AP) Mon 04/03 11:15 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Brief, Notice to Respondent, Proof of Service and Proposed Order Missing Related [+] - Brief, Notice to Respondent, Proof of Service and Proposed Order due on 04/10/2017. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] No.15 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant James F. Ormsby
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Mon 04/03 11:11 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant James F. Ormsby Related [+]. (J.A.J.)
Related: [-] 15 Motion For Summary Judgment
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Mon 04/03 11:10 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant James F. Ormsby Related [+]. (J.A.J.)
Related: [-] 15 Motion For Summary Judgment
15 15 motion Summary Judgment Mon 04/03 11:09 AM
Motion For Summary Judgment Pursuant to Rule 56 Filed by Defendant James F. Ormsby In Proper Person Re: 17-02022 dob (J.A.J.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2017
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Fri 03/24 11:00 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Defendant, James F. Ormsby Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] Doc. Nos.9 ,10 ,11 and12
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Fri 03/24 10:57 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Defendant, James F. Ormsby Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] Doc. Nos.9 ,10 ,11 and12
12 12 utility Jury Demand Fri 03/24 10:54 AM
Request for Jury Trial filed by Defendant, James F. Ormsby. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
11 11 court Document Fri 03/24 10:45 AM
Request for Subpoena Power to Produce Witnesses filed by Defendant, James F. Ormsby. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
10 10 court Document Fri 03/24 10:42 AM
Request for Subpoena Power to Acquire Legal Documents from Daniel C. Himmelspach filed by Defendant, James F. Ormsby. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
9 9 court Document Fri 03/24 10:40 AM
Request for Appointment of Legal Counsel filed by Defendant, James F. Ormsby. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2017
8 8 misc Letter Mon 03/20 10:18 AM
Letter Sent to James Ormsby, 7615 S. Steel Road, Saint Charles, Michigan 48655 Regarding Application For Pro Bono Counsel. Related [+] (seh)
Related: [-] 5 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant James F. Ormsby
Saturday, March 18, 2017
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 03/19 12:45 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/18/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference.
Thursday, March 16, 2017
6 6 court Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference Thu 03/16 8:57 AM
Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference. Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on 4/13/2017 at 03:00 PM at Courtroom, Bay City, 111 First St.. (Erickson, Wendy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2017
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/15 9:49 AM
Response by James F. Ormsby - In Proper Person to Complaint by Trustee to Recover Fraudulent Conveyance Pursuant to 11 USC 548 Filed by James F. Ormsby . (sms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 03/08 10:08 AM
Summons Service Executed on James F. Ormsby 2/20/2017 (Himmelspach, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2017
3 3 order Improper Service of Summons/Complaint on Defendant Thu 03/02 11:22 AM
Order Regarding Improper Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant - Proper Service of Summons and Complaint Due on 03/09/2017. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 20, 2017
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 02/20 4:21 PM
Summons Issued on James F. Ormsby Answer Due 03/22/2017 (Himmelspach, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 02/20 4:21 PM
Adversary case 17-02022 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Daniel Himmelspach against James F. Ormsby. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Himmelspach, Daniel)
Related: [-]