Luer et al v. St. Louis, Missouri, County of et al
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Nannette A Baker |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00767 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 26, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 20, 2017 4:51 AM CDT |
Defendant
St. Louis, Missouri, County of
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Clinton
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Benjamin Selz
|
|
Plaintiff
Jon Luer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrea Steinebach
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
John Doe I
Terminated: 06/05/2017
|
|
Defendant
John Doe II
Terminated: 06/05/2017
|
|
Defendant
Officer John Doe II
Terminated: 06/20/2017
|
1. | ACLU files lawsuit alleging St. Louis County police searched home without warrant (stltoday.com) |
Submitted Wed 02/22/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, May 26, 2022 | ||
160 | 160
order
Judgment - (Case)
Thu 05/26 3:32 PM
JUDGMENT. In accordance with the notice of offer of judgment and acceptance thereof, ECF No. 157, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendant St. Louis County, Missouri, on the remaining claims of Count I of the Second Amended Complaint, ECF No. 23, in the amount of $300,000.00, inclusive of attorneys fees and costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED the claims in Counts II and III of the Second Amended Complaint are dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that all claims against Defendants Michael Clinton and Benjamin Selz are dismissed with prejudice. Pursuant to Local Rule 13.05, Section B(2), if a party wishes for any documents previously filed under seal to remain sealed, a Motion to Continue Sealing must be filed in this case within 90 days following the final disposition of the litigation. 60-Day Reminder for LR 13.05 Unsealing 7/25/2022 90-day Reminder for LR 13.05 Unsealing 8/24/2022 Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 5/26/2022. (HMA) |
|
Monday, May 23, 2022 | ||
157 | 157
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 05/23 9:18 AM
NOTICE offer of judgment and acceptance thereof: by Plaintiff Andrea Steinebach (Rothert, Anthony) |
|
155 | 155
motion
Substitute Party
Mon 05/23 9:15 AM
Consent MOTION to Substitute Party by Plaintiff Jon Luer. (Rothert, Anthony) |
|
order
A Docket Text Order
Mon 05/23 9:17 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:155 Consent MOTION to Substitute Party; ORDERED GRANTED Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 5/23/2022. (JEB) |
||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Mon 05/23 9:58 AM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker: Settlement Conference held on 5/23/2022. Parties present. Consent Motion to Substitute Party #155 is GRANTED. Notice of Offer of Judgment filed. Order to follow. (proceedings started: 9:01 am) (proceedings ended: 9:20 am) (FTR Gold Operator Initials: J. Bailey)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Jessie Staffan and Anthoy Rothert)(Appearance for Defendant: Rachel Schwarzlose) (JEB) |
||
order
A Docket Text Order
Mon 05/23 10:58 AM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, in accordance with the Notice of Offer of Judgment and Acceptance (Doc. 157), the parties shall jointly submit a proposed final judgment by May 27, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on May 23, 2022. (JMR) |
||
Saturday, May 21, 2022 | ||
order
A Docket Text Order with Schedules
Sat 05/21 9:06 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Having been advised that the parties have reached a settlement in this matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Jury Trial currently set to begin on May 23, 2022 is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED as moot. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that a status conference is SET for May 23, 2022 at 9:00 am. ( Status Conference set for 5/23/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13N - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on May 21, 2022. (JMR) |
||
Friday, May 20, 2022 | ||
153 | 153
misc
Entry of Appearance
Fri 05/20 2:58 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Andrea Staci Alper for Defendants Michael Clinton, Benjamin Selz, St. Louis, Missouri, County of. (Alper, Andrea) |
|
152 | 152
3
pgs
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
Fri 05/20 10:38 AM
ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to exclude the testimony of John. J. Ryan (Doc. 150) is taken with the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to exclude evidence of Plaintiffs' financial status (Doc. 136) is taken with the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to exclude evidence of the identification of Plaintiffs son (Doc. 137) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to exclude a "Golden Rule" appeal (Doc. 138) is GRANTED as unopposed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to exclude evidence that Defendants entered and searched the home due to exigent circumstances or as part of a protective sweep (Doc. 139) is taken with the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to exclude opinion testimony of Defendants as police officer experts (Doc. 140) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' motion to exclude testimony as to causation of medical or mental health conditions (Doc. 128, No. 1) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' motion to exclude statements of any treating medical or mental health professionals (Doc. 128, No. 2) is GRANTED as unopposed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' motion to exclude evidence of lost wages and future earnings (Doc. 128, No. 3) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' motion to exclude evidence regarding Plaintiffs' move to Germany (Doc. 128, No. 4) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' motion to exclude a punitive damages instruction (Doc. 128, No. 5) is taken with the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' motion to exclude other lawsuits involving Defendants (Doc. 128, No. 6) is GRANTED as unopposed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' motion to exclude other misconduct, reprimands, grievances, or complaints against Defendants (other than complaints in this specific case) (Doc. 128, No. 7) is GRANTED as unopposed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' motion to exclude Defendant Selz's current employment (Doc. 128, No. 8) is GRANTED as unopposed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' motion to exclude a "Golden Rule" appeal (Doc. 128, No. 9) is GRANTED as unopposed.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' motion to exclude photographs produced on May 16, 2022 (Doc. 128, No. 10) is taken with the case. - Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on May 20, 2022. (MCB) |
|
Thursday, May 19, 2022 | ||
minutes
Pretrial Conference
Thu 05/19 3:42 PM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker: Final Pretrial Conference held on 5/19/2022. Parties present. All pretrial matters heard by the Court. Pending Motions heard from both sides and ruled on the record. Order to follow. (Court Reporter:Gayle Madden, Gayle_Madden@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7987) (proceedings started: 10:04 am) (proceedings ended: 11:19 am) (Deputy Clerk: E. Brown)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Anthony Rothert, Jessie Steffan)(Appearance for Defendant: Rachel Schwarzlose) (EAB) |