Williams v. Specialty Tank Services Ltd et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sidney A Fitzwater |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00491 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 24, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 20, 2017 4:47 AM CDT |
Defendant
Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Specialty Tank Services Ltd
|
|
Plaintiff
Allen Williams
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Transferring to Another Division
Fri 02/24 4:04 PM
Order transferring case to the Fort Worth Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/24/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 02/24 12:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. for Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Parsons, Claire) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 02/24 12:39 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company (Parsons, Claire) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
utility
Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer
Fri 02/24 4:31 PM
Case copied to 4:17cv0181 Y. Transfer to Fort Worth Division complete; clerk to set Related Case hyperlink, clear unnecessary flags, etc. (ldm) |
||
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
qcref
Fitzwater
Wed 02/22 9:21 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mcrd) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 02/21 4:06 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Tarrant County, case number 153-290076-17 filed by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8224575) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Parsons, Claire) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Cover Sheet Supplement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) |