Torcini v. Johnson & Johnson Services Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00493 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 07, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 20, 2017 3:39 AM CDT |
Defendant
DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joyce Torcini
|
Represented By
|
Special Master
Special Master
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, September 07, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Tue 09/07 4:04 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS - Before the Court are Plaintiffs Counsel's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff, and Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy International Limited, DePuy, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Services, Inc. and Johnson and Johnson Internationals' Motion to Dismiss in the above listed case. Pursuant to the Dec. 17, 2019 Order, Plaintiffs Counsel's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff is GRANTED, and Plaintiff' Counsel is withdrawn. Further, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All fees and costs to be borne by each party incurring same. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/7/2021) (chmb) |
|
Monday, July 06, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Response/Objection
Mon 07/06 1:37 PM
RESPONSE filed by Joyce Torcini re:13 MOTION to Dismiss (Ruiz, Jade) |
|
Wednesday, June 17, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss
Wed 06/17 12:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson Inc, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc (Bruksch, Terri) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 13, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 04/13 4:07 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Without Substitution filed by Joyce Torcini (Ruiz, Jade) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 08, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 04/08 4:17 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER denying10 Movant's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Joyce Torcini without prejudice to refile. Movant may re-urge their motion after they fully comply with the Court's December 17, 2019 order, specifically "counsel for any plaintiff shall certify that a copy of any motion to withdraw and a copy of this Order were served on each plaintiff." See order No. 1067 in Case No. 3:11-MD-2244-K. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/8/2020) (chmb) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 04/08 3:22 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Without Substitution filed by Joyce TorciniAttorney Jade Ruiz added to party Joyce Torcini(pty:pla) (Ruiz, Jade) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/06 8:14 PM
Notice of filing Case Management Orders The following orders have been filed in 3:11-md-2244 and are available by using the links provided below. [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #10 ] [LINK:PINNACLE PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM] [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #11 ] [LINK:DEFENDANTS' FACT SHEET.] (cea) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Fri 03/24 12:19 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting7 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Substitute Counsel. Aimee Robert is hereby withdrawn and Andrew K. Gardner is hereby substituted in as Counsel for Plaintiff Torcini in this case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/24/2017) (chmb) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Substitute Attorney
Fri 03/24 12:15 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney, Removed attorney Aimee Robert, added attorney Andrew Kevin Gardner. Motion filed by Joyce Torcini (Gardner, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Substitute Counsel | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Fri 03/24 11:32 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER denying4 Motion to Substitute Attorney without prejudice to re-file. Because this is a tag-a-long case to MDL-2244, Plaintiff shall confer with opposing Counsel and may re-file their motion to substitute that contains the required certificate of conference. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/24/2017) (chmb) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
sealex
Sealed and/or Ex Parte Document
Wed 03/22 1:44 PM
(Document Restricted) Sealed Attorney Contact Information - Andrew Gardner (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Joyce Torcini (Gardner, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Substitute Attorney
Tue 03/21 5:18 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney, removed Aimee Robert, added attorney Andrew Kevin Gardner,Andrew Kevin Gardner for Joyce Torcini. Motion filed by Joyce TorciniAttorney Andrew Kevin Gardner added to party Joyce Torcini(pty:pla) (Gardner, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Substitute Counsel | ||
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 02/21 6:48 PM
NOTICE of Related Case 3:11-md-02244 filed by Joyce Torcini (Robert, Aimee) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Tue 02/21 6:46 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joyce Torcini. (Robert, Aimee) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/21 6:41 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Joyce Torcini. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8225231) Summons(es) not requested at this time. Filer indicates this case is related to MDL Case No. 2244, In re: DePuy Orthopedics, Inc., Pinnacle Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, pending before Judge Ed Kinkeade. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Robert, Aimee) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |