Chaparral CO2, L.L.C. v. Merit Energy Company, LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-11144
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-11144
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Laurie Selber Silverstein |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50052 |
Nature of Suit | 31 Bankruptcy - Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - §363(h) |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 02, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Merit Energy Company, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1-100, Inclusive
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chaparral CO2, L.L.C.
701 Cedar Lake Blvd.
Oklahoma City, OK 73114 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 10/02 10:13 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice related document(s)1 Filed by Chaparral CO2, L.L.C.. (Chipman, William) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 10/02 1:21 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-50052 Closed (NAB) |
||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
vCal
Minute Entry
Wed 06/14 11:13 AM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 06/14/2017 Subject: Omnibus AND Pre-trial Conference. (vCal Hearing ID (228111)). (LJJ) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Mon 06/12 11:28 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Chaparral Energy, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/14/2017 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Schlauch, Brendan) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
answer
Answer to Crossclaim
Fri 06/09 4:41 PM
Answer to Crossclaim Filed by LHS Smith & Smith LLP, Rock Creek Ranch I, LTD, SG Interests V, Ltd. (Busenkell, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Wed 05/31 9:52 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding (i) Plaintiff Chaparral CO2, L.L.C.s Motion to Dismiss Based on Permissive Abstention; and (ii) Plaintiff Chaparral CO2, L.L.C.s Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Based on Permissive Abstention Filed by Chaparral CO2, L.L.C.. (Olivere, Mark) |
|
Saturday, May 27, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Crossclaim
Sat 05/27 10:51 AM
Answer to Crossclaim Filed by Merit Energy Company, LLC (Demmy, John) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Memorandum of Law
Fri 05/26 6:21 PM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Based on Permissive Abstention Filed by Chaparral CO2, L.L.C.. (Olivere, Mark) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding - Motion
Fri 05/26 6:19 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Chaparral CO2, L.L.C.. (Olivere, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order | ||
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice
Mon 05/01 9:45 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Chaparral Energy, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/2/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Schlauch, Brendan) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Fri 04/28 9:42 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Chaparral Energy, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/2/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Barsalona II, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Stipulation
Tue 04/25 3:07 PM
Stipulation (Third) Between Chaparral CO2, L.L.C. and Merit Energy Company, LLC for Extension of Time for Defendant Merit to Respond to the Complaint . Filed by Chaparral CO2, L.L.C. . (Chipman, William) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Stipulation
Tue 04/25 3:03 PM
Stipulation (Second) Between Chaparral CO2, L.L.C. and Merit Energy Company, LLC and Doe Defendants, SG Interests V, Ltd., Rock Creek Ranch I, Ltd., and LHS, Smith & Smith, Ltd., L.L.P. for Extension of Time for (i) Plaintiff to Respond to Amended Counterclaims; and (ii) Defendant Merit to Respond to Amended Crossclaims of "Doe" Defendants . Filed by Chaparral CO2, L.L.C. . (Chipman, William) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Stipulation
Wed 04/12 11:21 AM
Stipulation Between Chaparral CO2, L.L.C. and Merit Energy Company, LLC and "Doe" Defendants SG Interests V, Ltd., Rock Creek Ranch I, Ltd. and LHS, Smith & Smith, Ltd., L.L.P. for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Amended Counterclaims and Defendant Merit Energy Company, LLC to Respond to Amended Crossclaims of various "Doe" Defendants . Filed by Chaparral CO2, L.L.C.. (Chipman, William) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Stipulation
Fri 04/07 1:06 PM
Stipulation [SECOND] Between Merit Energy Company, LLC and Chaparral CO2, LLC for Extension of Time for Defendant Merit Energy Company to Respond to the Complaint . Filed by Merit Energy Company, LLC . (Demmy, John) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice
Tue 03/28 11:02 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Chaparral Energy, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 3/30/2017 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Barsalona II, Joseph) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer|cmp|cmp
Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim|Crossclaim
Fri 03/24 4:51 PM
Amended Answer to Complaint , Counterclaim by LHS Smith & Smith LLP, Rock Creek Ranch I, LTD, SG Interests V, Ltd. against Chaparral CO2, L.L.C., Crossclaim by LHS Smith & Smith LLP, Rock Creek Ranch I, LTD, SG Interests V, Ltd. against Merit Energy Company, LLC Filed by LHS Smith & Smith LLP, Rock Creek Ranch I, LTD, SG Interests V, Ltd. Mediation due date: 07/24/2017.(Busenkell, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Stipulation
Thu 03/23 3:19 PM
Stipulation Between Merit Energy Company, LLC and Chaparral CO2, LLC for Extension of Time for Defendant Merit Energy Company to Respond to the Complaint . Filed by Merit Energy Company, LLC. (Demmy, John) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Stipulation
Thu 03/23 9:30 AM
Stipulation Between Merit Energy Company, LLC and Chaparral CO2, LLC for Extension of Time for Defendant Merit Energy Company to Respond to the Complaint . Filed by Merit Energy Company, LLC. (Demmy, John) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
answer|cmp
Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim
Wed 03/22 10:46 AM
Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by LHS Smith & Smith LLP, Rock Creek Ranch I, LTD, SG Interests V, Ltd. against Chaparral CO2, L.L.C. Filed by LHS Smith & Smith LLP, Rock Creek Ranch I, LTD, SG Interests V, Ltd. Mediation due date: 07/20/2017.(Busenkell, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Wed 02/22 2:19 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Merit Energy Company, LLC. Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2017 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/24/2017. (Chipman, William) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives | ||
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Exhibit
Tue 02/21 6:49 PM
Exhibit(s) A through D Related to Complaint for Order Authorizing the Sale of Property of the Estate and of Co-Owner Filed by Chaparral CO2, L.L.C.. (Chipman, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit B - Articles of Agreement | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit C - Operation Agreement | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit D - CO2 Contract | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 02/21 6:42 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-50052 LSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8349278, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Tue 02/21 6:39 PM
Adversary case 17-50052 Complaint for Order Authorizing the Sale of Property of the Estate and of Co-Owner by Chaparral CO2, L.L.C. against Merit Energy Company, LLC, Does 1-100, Inclusive. Fee Amount $350 (31 (Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - 363(h))). AP Summons Served due date: 05/22/2017. (Chipman, William) |