London v. Navient Solutions LLC
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | J Leon Holmes |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00107 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 21, 2017 4:39 AM CDT |
Defendant
Navient Solutions LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sonya London
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago |
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 04/19 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sonya London (Byrd, J.) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)
Mon 04/10 3:56 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Navient Solutions LLC (Henry, Judy) |
|
10 | 10
brief
Brief in Support
Mon 04/10 3:55 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re9 Motion to Compel Defendant's Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Navient Solutions LLC. (Henry, Judy) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Compel
Mon 04/10 3:54 PM
MOTION to Compel Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration by Navient Solutions LLC(Henry, Judy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 04/10 9:53 AM
ORDER granting the defendant's7 second motion for extension of time. The time within which defendant must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended up to and including 4/24/2017. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/10/2017. (ljb) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 04/07 4:56 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer () by Navient Solutions LLC (Henry, Judy) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/28 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jaimie Grunert Moss on behalf of Navient Solutions LLC (Moss, Jaimie) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 03/22 10:08 AM
ORDER granting the defendant's4 motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint. The time within which defendant must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended up to and including 4/10/2017. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/22/2017. (ljb) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 03/21 3:22 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint by Navient Solutions LLC (Henry, Judy) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/21 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Judy Simmons Henry on behalf of Navient Solutions LLC (Henry, Judy) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 03/01 5:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Sonya London. Navient Solutions LLC served on 3/1/2017. (Byrd, J.) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
40
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/22 1:58 PM
PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Navient Solutions LLC filed by Sonya London. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT060611.) (ljb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |