Lee v. Lubbock County Sheriffs Office et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam R Cummings |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00041 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment
Mon 03/13 2:44 PM
JUDGMENT: Plaintiff's case is dismissed without prejudice as frivolous. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/13/2017) (egp) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous
Mon 03/13 2:42 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE AS FRIVOLOUS and for failure to state a claim. Plaintiffis cautioned that if he accumulates three strikes, he may not proceed in forma pauperis in any civil action or appeal filed while he is incarcerated or detained in any facility unless he is in imminent danger of serious physical injury. Plaintiff is advised that if he appeals this Order, he will be required to pay the appeal fee of $505.00 pursuant to the PLRA, and he must submit an application to proceed informapauperis and a 6-month Certificate of Inmate Trust Account at the same time he files his noticeof appeal. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/13/2017) (egp) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 03/13 2:47 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8,9. Mon Mar 13 14:47:56 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order For Partial Filing Fee
Thu 03/09 10:53 AM
PLRA FILING FEE ORDER: Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall pay $350.00 filing fee in monthly installments with no initial partial fee assessed. Clerk to mail this order to the attention of the Inmate Trust Fund Department at the facility where the inmate resides. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/9/2017) (egp) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Tue 03/07 2:09 PM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Timothy Patrick Lee. (egp) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/07 8:45 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Timothy Patrick Lee (egp) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order And Notice of Deficiency
Fri 02/24 9:40 AM
FILING FEE DEFICIENCY ORDER: Timothy Patrick Lee must address the following deficiency: Pay Filing Fee of $400.00 or file signed application to proceed in forma pauperis and certified copy of inmate trust account and authorization. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal. Deadline to cure the deficiency is 20 days. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 2/24/2017) (egp) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 02/24 9:41 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. IFP/Cert mailed Fri Feb 24 09:41:28 CST 2017 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Wed 02/22 2:38 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (zzm) |
|
2 | 2
qcref
Cummings (West Texas)
Wed 02/22 2:38 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zzm) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/22 2:37 PM
COMPLAINT against Lubbock County Sheriffs Office, Wal-Mart filed by Timothy Patrick Lee. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (zzm) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 02/22 2:39 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2,3. Wed Feb 22 14:39:22 CST 2017 (crt) |