Olmstead v. Pigg
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam R Cummings |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00044 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 31, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 21, 2017 4:38 AM CDT |
Defendant
Harold H Pigg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Al Olmstead
220 West 2nd Street
Littlefield, TX 79339 |
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion to Stay
Thu 06/01 2:13 PM
ORDER finding as moot5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. ; finding as moot [] Motion to Stay ; granting9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject MatterJurisdiction and, Alternatively, Motion to Stay is DENIED as moot but Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Lack of Standing (and included, alternative, request to dismiss pursuant to the abstention doctrine) is GRANTED. Defendant's alternative Motion to Stay is DENIED as moot. The above-styled and -numbered civil action is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 6/1/2017) (bmg) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Judgment
Thu 06/01 2:19 PM
JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the claims of Plaintiff, Al Olmstead, against Defendant, Harold H. Pigg, in the above-styled and-numbered civil action are DISMISSED without prejudice. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 5/31/2017) (bmg) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response/Objection
Thu 05/04 10:09 AM
PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE filed by Al Olmstead re:9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (bmg) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Fri 04/21 2:30 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Harold H Pigg re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Pigg, Harold) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 04/21 2:27 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Harold H Pigg (Pigg, Harold) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit(s) Harold H. Pigg | ||
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 04/11 10:46 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Harold H Pigg filed by Al Olmstead. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bmg) (Main Document 8 replaced on 4/11/2017) (bmg) |
|
7 | 7
respm
Response/Objection
Tue 04/11 10:41 AM
RESPONSE filed by Al Olmstead re:5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and, Alternatively, Motion to Stay (bmg) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Mon 04/03 10:05 AM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Harold H Pigg re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and, Alternatively, Motion to Stay (Pigg, Harold) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 04/03 10:02 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and, Alternatively, Motion to Stay filed by Harold H PiggAttorney Harold Houston Pigg added to party Harold H Pigg(pty:dft) (Pigg, Harold) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit(s) Affidavit of Harold H. Pigg, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C | ||
motion
Stay
Mon 04/03 10:23 AM
MOTION to Stay re1 Complaint filed by Harold H Pigg. ***SEE DOCUMENT NO. 5 FOR IMAGE.*** (bdg) |
||
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 02/22 4:52 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Al Olmstead. (zzm) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Wed 02/22 4:49 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (zzm) |
|
2 | 2
qcref
Cummings (West Texas)
Wed 02/22 4:49 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zzm) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/22 4:48 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Harold H Pigg filed by Al Olmstead. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number LU009136) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (zzm) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 02/22 4:50 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2,3. Wed Feb 22 16:50:26 CST 2017 (crt) |