Microsoft Corporation v. John Does 1-10
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Ricardo S Martinez |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00286 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Feb 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 24, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 21, 2017 2:55 AM PDT |
Defendant
John Does 1-10
|
|
Plaintiff
Microsoft Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Report
Wed 11/01 12:22 PM
REPORT on the determination of an action regarding a Copyright. Mailed to the Copyright Office. (SWT) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 10/24 9:30 AM
***Civil Case Terminated per22 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (PM) |
||
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case)
Mon 10/23 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation (MacNaughton, Bonnie) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
2 - Minute Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 08/22 2:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER re:20 Status Report filed by Microsoft Corporation by Chief Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. The Court finds good cause to allow Plaintiff an additional 60 days to attempt resolution of this case prior to filing an Amended Complaint for the reasons set forth in its Status Report to the Court. Accordingly, there is also good cause to extend all current deadlines in this matter. The parties' deadlines are as follows: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/17/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/24/2017, and Joint Status Report due by 12/1/2017.(SSM) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Status Report
Mon 08/21 11:50 AM
Second STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation (Howlett, Brooke) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
2 - Minute Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 05/23 1:24 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Ricardo S. Martinez re:18 Status Report filed by Microsoft Corporation. The Court finds good cause to allow Plaintiff an additional 90 days to attempt resolution of this case prior to filing an Amended Complaint for the reasons set forth in its Status Report to the Court. Accordingly, there is also good cause to extend all current deadlines in this matter. The parties' deadlines are as follows: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/15/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/22/2017, and Joint Status Report due by 9/29/2017. (SSM) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Status Report
Tue 05/23 10:06 AM
STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation (MacNaughton, Bonnie) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges
Thu 05/18 10:38 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 6/29/2017, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/15/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/22/2017, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Expedite
Mon 03/27 3:35 PM
ORDER granting plaintiff's14 Motion to Expedite Discovery by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Declaration
Thu 03/23 2:48 PM
DECLARATION of Brittany Carmichael in Support of Microsoft's Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re14 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Howlett, Brooke) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Expedite
Thu 03/23 2:45 PM
MOTION to Expedite Discovery , filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. Noting Date 3/23/2017, (Howlett, Brooke) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order Reassigning Case
Fri 03/10 11:17 AM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S Martinez for all further proceedings because it is related to C14-1851RSM; all pleadings filed in the future shall bear cause no C17-286RSM by Judge Richard A Jones. (RS) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
1 - Order
Wed 03/08 1:24 PM
STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) |
|
11 | 11
order
2 - Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 03/08 1:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER entered upon the authority of Judge Richard A. Jones. The Court STRIKES the Order Regarding Initial Disclosures, Joint Status Report, and Early Settlement entered by Magistrate Judge Mary Alice Theiler on 2/23/2017. This matter has now been reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones for all further proceedings. The Court will enter new initial case scheduling deadlines upon Defendants' appearance. (VE) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 03/06 5:20 PM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by William M. McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A Jones for all further proceedings. Hon. Mary Alice Theiler no longer assigned to case. Cc to RAJ. (KMP) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for Magistrate Judges
Thu 02/23 4:43 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Joint Status Report due by 4/6/2017, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/23/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/30/2017. (KMP) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Consent Letter & Form - Gen Civil
Thu 02/23 4:42 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT OR DECLINE FORM. If consent or decline, return the executed form by 4/6/2017. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KMP) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Report
Thu 02/23 1:54 PM
REPORT on the filing of a Copyright by Plaintiff(s) Microsoft Corporation. (Sent via U.S. Postal Service to Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office). (DJ) |
|
6 | 6
utility
Report Regarding Patent & Trademark
Thu 02/23 1:09 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent Office. (DJ) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 02/23 1:06 PM
Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (DJ) |
||
notice
Notice-Other
Thu 02/23 1:43 PM
NOTICE to Filer: COPYRIGHT REPORT NOT FILED: Pursuant to LCR 3(a), all civil action complaints in which jurisdiction is invoked in whole or in part under 28 U.S.C. Section 1338 shall be accompanied by the required notice to the Patent and Trademark Office (form AO120) or the required notice to the Register of Copyrights (Form AO121). If this is such a case, please complete the appropriate form and email it to the new cases box at newcases.seattle@wawd.uscourts.gov. Please include in the subject line the name and number of the case and the name of the document attached. This form will then be posted to the case docket and a copy sent to the appropriate entity. Thank you.(DJ) |
||
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice-Other
Wed 02/22 2:09 PM
NOTICE of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or Trademark re1 Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (MacNaughton, Bonnie) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice-Other
Wed 02/22 2:04 PM
NOTICE of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright re1 Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (MacNaughton, Bonnie) |
|
3 | 3
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 02/22 1:35 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Microsoft Corporation (MacNaughton, Bonnie) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Related Case
Wed 02/22 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:14-cv-1772; 2:14-cv-1851; 2:14-cv-1852; 2:15-cv-186; 2:15-cv-440; 2:15-cv-483;2:15-cv-497; 2:15-cv-663; 2:16-cv-276; 2:16-cv-328; 2:16-cv-804; 2:16-cv-807; 2:16-cv-1086; 2:16-cv-1088; 2:16-cv-1234; 2:16-cv-1899; 3:17-cv-5085, by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (MacNaughton, Bonnie) |
|
1 | 1
19
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/22 1:31 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) John Does 1-10 using IP address 173.10.29.66 Attorney Bonnie Elizabeth MacNaughton added to party Microsoft Corporation(pty:pla), filed by Microsoft Corporation.(MacNaughton, Bonnie) |
|
Att: 1 61 pgs Exhibit 1-24, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 25-50, | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet |