California Central District Court
Judge:Dolly M Gee
Referred: Gail J Standish
Case #: 2:17-cv-01470
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2017
Terminated:Jan 04, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 22, 2017 2:23 AM PDT
Defendant
Yucatan Foods, LP
Represented By
Joshua A Hiller
Afifi Law Group
contact info
Benjamin Kussman
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Faryan Andrew Afifi
Afifi Law Group
contact info
Cheryl S Chang
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Nadia Darkazalli Adams
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Jessica A McElroy
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Defendant
DOES
Plaintiff
Scott Miller
Represented By
Kristen Marie Gelinas Simplicio
Gutride Safier LLP
contact info
Adam Joshua Gutride
Gutride Safier LLP
contact info
Seth A Safier
Gutride Safier LLP
contact info
Marie Ann McCrary
Gutride Safier LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, January 04, 2018
54 54 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 01/05 9:59 AM
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: In light of the parties' Stipulation for Dismissal filed on 1/4/201853 , the Court hereby DISMISSES this action without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). All scheduled dates and deadlines are VACATED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
Related: [-]
53 53 stip Dismiss Case Thu 01/04 10:55 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiffs Scott Miller, Brendan Peacock.(Safier, Seth)
Related: [-]