Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-16885

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:17-ap-01062
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2017
Terminated:Sep 20, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc.
Represented By
The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles M. Berk
GrayRobinson, P.A. c/o Steven J. Solomon, Esq. 333 SE 2nd Avenue, Suite 3200
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Steven J. Solomon, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 20, 2017
9 9 court Close Adversary Case Wed 09/20 11:13 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-1062 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2017
8 8 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Mon 08/07 10:17 AM
Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding (with prejudice) Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk. (Schatzman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2017
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Mon 05/15 4:46 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 6 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued
6 6 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Mon 05/15 8:31 AM
Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2017 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
Monday, May 01, 2017
5 5 court Notice of Continued Pretrial Conference Mon 05/01 3:48 PM
Notice of Continued Pretrial Conference Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 05/24/2017 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Shuler, Pamela)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01062 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc.. Filing Fee Paid. Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)
Monday, February 27, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Mon 02/27 2:47 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk,2 Summons Issued,3 Order Setting Requirements
Friday, February 24, 2017
3 3 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Fri 02/24 9:59 AM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 20 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 02/24 9:58 AM
Summons Issued on The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc. Answer Due 3/27/2017 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 05/03/2017 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
Thursday, February 23, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/23 4:35 PM
Adversary case 17-01062 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc.. Filing Fee Paid. Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A