California Eastern District Court
Judge:Morrison C England, Jr
Referred: Edmund F Brennan
Case #: 2:17-cv-00409
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2017
Terminated:Aug 10, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 22, 2017 2:12 AM PDT
Defendant
AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Represented By
Sharon Mayo
Arnold & Porter LLP
contact info
Amy Kathleen Fisher, PHV
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
James J. Freebery, IV, PHV
Mccarter English, LLP
contact info
Katherine Dorothea Althoff, PHV
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Makenzie Windfelder, PHV
Mccarter English, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gary Costamagna
Represented By
Joshua H. Watson
Clayeo C. Arnold, A Professional Law Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Penelope Costamagna
Represented By
Joshua H. Watson
Clayeo C. Arnold, A Professional Law Corporation
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Procter & Gamble Company
Terminated: 06/01/2017
Represented By
Stephen W. Robertson
Hardy Erich Brown & Wilson
contact info

GPO May 03 2017
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/3/2017 ORDERING that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before Friday, 5/26/2017. (Zignago, K.)
GPO Jun 01 2017
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/31/17 ORDERING that Defendant The Procter & Gamble Company, is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
GPO Jun 20 2017
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/16/17 ORDERING that the Court's Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order (ECF No. 3) is hereby VACATED and this action is STAYED in all respects pending the JPML decision on the pending Motion to Transfer. This matter is SET for a Status Conference on 9/21/2017 at 02:00 PM. That conference will establish a schedule for adjudicating the case depending on the status of the matter at that time. The parties are ORDERED to file a Joint Proposed Scheduling Order within seven (7) calendars days preceding the status conference. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
GPO Aug 10 2017
MDL ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to District of New Jersey. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J)

Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, August 22, 2017
misc Other Court Case Number Tue 08/22 8:20 AM
OTHER COURT CASE NUMBER from District of New Jersey case number 2:17-cv-06004. (Robles, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2017
31 31 order Order ~Util - Case Transferred Out - District Thu 08/10 8:38 AM
MDL ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to District of New Jersey. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2017
30 30 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Case Stayed Tue 06/20 11:03 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/16/17 ORDERING that the Court's Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order (ECF No.3 ) is hereby VACATED and this action is STAYED in all respects pending the JPML decision on the pending Motion to Transfer. This matter is SET for a Status Conference on 9/21/2017 at 02:00 PM. That conference will establish a schedule for adjudicating the case depending on the status of the matter at that time. The parties are ORDERED to file a Joint Proposed Scheduling Order within seven (7) calendars days preceding the status conference. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2017
29 29 misc Exhibit Fri 06/09 3:20 PM
EXHIBIT A to Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Stay Action Pending Decision From the United States Judical Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP re28 Stipulation and Proposed Order. (Mayo, Sharon)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 06/09 11:08 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Staying Action Pending a Decision From the United States Judical Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Mayo, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2017
misc Acknowledgement of Receipt Tue 06/06 3:04 PM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of CD from SeegerWeiss LLP Case number: RE MDL No. 2789. [ROUTED TO CHAMBERS] (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2017
27 27 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 06/05 11:17 AM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Mayo, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2017
26 26 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Thu 06/01 9:38 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/31/17 ORDERING that Defendant The Procter & Gamble Company, is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2017
25 25 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 05/25 3:00 PM
STIPULATION of DISMISSAL and Proposed Order by The Procter & Gamble Company. (Robertson, Stephen)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 05/25 11:31 AM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: Pursuant to the filing of the First Amended Complaint (ECF No. 23), Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 9) set for hearing on June 29, 2017, is denied as moot and the hearing is vacated. (Deutsch, S)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2017
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 05/22 8:58 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Penelope Costamagna, Gary Costamagna.(Watson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2017
22 22 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Tue 05/16 10:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 9), set for hearing on June 15, 2017, is vacated and continued to June 29, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 7. The opposition or statement of non-opposition, and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. (Deutsch, S)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2017
21 21 misc Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge Fri 05/12 10:41 AM
DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Mayo, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2017
20 20 order Pro Hac Vice Order Wed 05/10 3:23 PM
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/9/2017 ADDING attorney Amy Kathleen Fisher, PHV for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Washington, S)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Pro Hac Vice Order Wed 05/10 2:45 PM
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/9/2017 ADDING attorney Makenzie Windfelder, PHV for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Washington, S)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Pro Hac Vice Order Wed 05/10 2:39 PM
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/9/2017 ADDING attorney James J. Freebery, IV, PHV for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Washington, S)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Pro Hac Vice Order Wed 05/10 2:32 PM
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/9/2017 ADDING attorney Katherine Dorothea Althoff, PHV for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Washington, S)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2017
16 16 order Minute Order Mon 05/08 11:43 AM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court received the PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS and PROPOSED ORDERS (ECF Nos. 12-15). Pursuant to Local Rule 137(b), regarding the requirements for proper filing of a proposed order, you are required to email the proposed orders (in Microsoft Word) to chambers in addition to filing the pdf version via the CM/ECF system. Pursuant to Local Rule 101, the definition for "signature", you may enter /s/ for signatures for all counsel. Please submit your proposed orders today, in Microsoft Word format to: mceorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Deutsch, S)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2017
15 15 misc Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Fri 05/05 4:45 PM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP for attorney Makenzie Windfelder to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7050060) (Mayo, Sharon)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Fri 05/05 3:42 PM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP for attorney James J. Freebery, IV to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7049862) (Mayo, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2017
13 13 misc Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Thu 05/04 5:22 PM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP for attorney Katherine Dorothea Althoff to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7048048) (Mayo, Sharon)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Thu 05/04 4:41 PM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP for attorney Amy Kathleen Fisher to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7047938) (Mayo, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2017
11 11 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 05/03 1:32 PM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/3/2017 ORDERING that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before Friday, 5/26/2017. (Zignago, K.)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2017
10 10 respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 05/01 4:28 PM
MEMORANDUM by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP in SUPPORT of9 MOTION to DISMISS. (Mayo, Sharon)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Dismiss Mon 05/01 4:25 PM
MOTION to DISMISS by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Mayo, Sharon)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Stipulation Mon 05/01 11:39 AM
STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint by The Procter & Gamble Company. Attorney Robertson, Stephen W. added. (Robertson, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2017
7 7 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge Thu 04/27 10:25 AM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Gary Costamagna, Penelope Costamagna. (Watson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2017
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/18 4:41 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: The Procter & Gamble Company served on 4/10/2017, answer due 5/1/2017. (Watson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2017
5 5 misc Statement Thu 04/13 4:03 PM
STATEMENT of Corporate Disclosure by Defendant AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Mayo, Sharon)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Stipulation Thu 04/13 3:00 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP to File Response to Complaint [E.D. CA Local Rule 144(a)] by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. Attorney Mayo, Sharon added. (Mayo, Sharon) Modified on 4/13/2017 (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2017
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for MCE Fri 02/24 9:40 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Kastilahn, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
2 2 service Summons Fri 02/24 9:39 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, The Procter & Gamble Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joshua H. Watson* *Arnold Law Firm* *865 Howe Avenue* *Sacramento, CA 95825*. (Kastilahn, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2017
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/24 12:01 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants by PENELOPE COSTAMAGNA, COSTAMAGNA GARY. Attorney Watson, Joshua H. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6929644)(Watson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet