King et al v. LMCHH PCP, LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jerry A Brown |
Case #: | 2:17-ap-01024 |
Nature of Suit | 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Feb 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 10, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
LMCHH PCP, LLC
3867 Plaza Tower Drive
Baton Rouge, LA 70816 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, LLC, aka Louisiana Heart Hospital, LLC
64030 Louisiana Highway 434
Lacombe, LA 70445 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
CCG of Louisiana, LLC, aka Cardiovascular Care Group
3867 Plaza Tower Drive
Baton Rouge, LA 70816 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry King
1100 Third Avenue
Picayune, MS 39466 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
April Eschete
67440 Armel Road
Mandeville, LA 70471 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leonida B. Galloway
65012 Fish Hatchery Rd.
Lacombe, LA 70445 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marvette Leblanc-Clarkston
7242 Boston Drive
New Orleans, LA 70127 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Fayard, III
756 Wood Duck Lane
Slidell, LA 70461 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bambilynn Jordan
812 Joans Street
Mandeville, LA 70448 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lou Ann Lea
204 N. Jayson Drive
Slidell, LA 70458 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Monica Smith
539 Jack Drive
Covington, LA 70433 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marlena Ross
1 Meadows Blvd. Apt. 119
Slidell, LA 70460 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:07 PM CDT |
Wednesday, October 30, 2019 | ||
59 | 59
court
Transcript (AP)
Wed 10/30 12:50 PM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript. Notice is given that an official transcript of the hearing held on April 5, 2017 has been filed. Pursuant to Judicial Conference policy, transcripts are available for inspection only at the clerk's office or may be purchased from the court transcriber for a 90 day period. Contact the clerk's office to request a copy. Attorneys who purchase transcripts will automatically be given PACER access by the clerk's office to the electronic transcript.. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/6/2019. Redaction Request Due By 11/20/2019. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 12/2/2019. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/28/2020. NOTE: Matter heard jointly with case 17-1021 (Nunnery, J.) |