Larry's Import Center, Inc.
Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Frank J Santoro |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-70635 |
Case Filed: | Feb 28, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 03, 2017 |
Debtor
Larry's Import Center, Inc.
1801 Virginia Beach Blvd
Virginia Beach, VA 23454-4416 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 02/28/2017 4:06 PM EST |
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition
Tue 02/28 12:21 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filed by Gregory K. Pugh of Gregory K. Pugh, P.C. on behalf of Larry's Import Center, Inc.. (Pugh, Gregory) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 02/28 12:22 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition 17-70635 [misc,1125] ( 335.00) filing fee. Receipt number 25727680, amount $ 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |