South Carolina District Court
Judge:Timothy M Cain
Case #: 6:17-cv-00551
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2017
Terminated:May 08, 2017
Last checked: Monday Aug 28, 2017 5:16 AM EDT
Defendant
RevMD Partners LLC
Plaintiff
Marquin Campbell
Represented By
George Anthony Campbell, Jr
Campbell Teague LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, May 08, 2017
8 8 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 05/08 11:35 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Marquin Campbell. (Campbell, George)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2017
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Thu 03/09 5:31 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marquin Campbell. RevMD Partners LLC served on 3/3/2017, answer due 3/24/2017.(Campbell, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, February 28, 2017
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 02/28 12:28 PM
Summons Issued as to RevMD Partners LLC. (kmca)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2017
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 02/28 12:25 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Marquin Campbell.(kmca)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/28 12:24 PM
COMPLAINT against RevMD Partners LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-7020442), filed by Marquin Campbell. Service due by 5/30/2017.(kmca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Notice of Collection 11-29-16,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Notice of Collection 12-28-16