Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:17-bk-10477
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2017
Dismissed:Dec 13, 2017
Terminated:Dec 28, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
California Proton Treatment Center, LLC
9730 Summers Ridge Road
San Diego, CA 92121
Represented By
David L. Swanson
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Jonathan W. Young
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Justin K. Edelson
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Michael B. Kind
contact info
Christopher A. Ward
Polsinelli PC
contact info
David W. Wirt
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Phillip Wesley Nelson
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Stephen J. Humeniuk
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Brian A. Raynor
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Aaron Smith
Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell LLP
contact info
Debtor
California Proton Treatment Center, LLC, Debtor
9730 Summers Ridge Rd
San Diego, CA 92121-3101
Represented By
Christopher A. Ward
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 1:12 PM EST
Attorney
Polsinelli PC
Represented By
Christopher A. Ward
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Attorney
Locke Lord LLP
Represented By
Christopher A. Ward
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Creditor
Varian Medical Systems, Inc. and Varian Medical Systems International A.G.
Represented By
Jamie Lynne Edmonson
Venable LLP
contact info
K. John Shaffer
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Daniel A. O'Brien
Venable LLP
contact info
Creditor
Scripps Clinic Medical Group, Inc. and Scripps Health
Represented By
Jeffrey D. Cawdrey
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Megan M. Adeyemo
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Justin R. Alberto
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Gregory Joseph Flasser
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
San Diego Gas and Electric Company
Represented By
John M. Craig
Law Firm Of Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Dell Financial Services L.L.C.
811 Barton Springs Road Suite 811
Austin, TX 78704
Represented By
Sabrina L. Streusand
Streusand, Landon, Ozburn & Lemmon, LLP
contact info
Financial Advisor
Cain Brothers & Company, LLC
Represented By
Christopher A. Ward
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Health Care Ombudsman
Melanie L. Cyganowski
Otterbourg, Steindler, Houston & Rosen, 230 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10169
Represented By
Jennifer S. Feeney
Otterbourg Steindler Houston Rosen P.C.
contact info
Mary Caloway
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Richard J. Corbi
contact info
Kathleen A. Murphy
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Health Care Ombudsman
Andrew R. Vara
844 King Street Suite 2207
Wilmington, DE 19801
Interested Party
ORIX Capital Markets, LLC, as agent under the prepetition credit facility and proposed postpetition credit facility
Represented By
Haig M. Maghakian
Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & Mccloy LLP
contact info
Mark D. Collins
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Thomas R. Kreller
Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & Mccloy LLP
contact info
Gregory A. Bray
Milbank Tweed Hadley & Mccloy LLP
contact info
Brett Michael Haywood
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Interested Party
SCG Capital Corporation
Represented By
Alan M. Grochal
Tydings & Rosenberg LLP
contact info
Brett D. Fallon
Morris James LLP
contact info
Joseph M. Selba
Tydings & Rosenberg LLP
contact info
Other Prof.
Carl Marks Advisory Group LLC
Represented By
Justin K. Edelson
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Christopher A. Ward
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Other Prof.
RSM US LLP
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Linda J. Casey
Office Of United States Trustee
contact info
Brya Michele Keilson
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Friday, January 26, 2018
464 464 court Standing Order/Transcripts Fri 01/26 10:33 AM
The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 1 26-2018 to 2 9-2018 To obtain a copy of a transcript, contact the transcriber, Reliable, at telephone number: 302-654-8080. (MPM)
Related: [-]