Big Time Holdings, LLC
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Nancy Hershey Lord |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-40960 |
Case Filed: | Mar 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 11, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Big Time Holdings, LLC
20015 Linden Blvd
Saint Albans, NY 11412-3200 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn Office) U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Suite 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 02/28/2017 7:00 PM EST |
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Automatic docket of credit card/debit card
Wed 03/01 2:04 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(1 17-40960 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 15199741. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
6
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 03/01 2:02 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by David Y Wolnerman on behalf of Big Time Holdings, LLC Chapter 11 Plan - Small Business - due by 08/28/2017. Chapter 11 Small Business Disclosure Statement due by 08/28/2017. (Wolnerman, David) |
|
2 | 2
court
Deficient Filing Chapter 11
Thu 03/02 3:03 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 3/1/2017.Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 3/1/2017. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 3/1/2017. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 3/1/2017. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 3/1/2017. Small Business Balance Sheet due by 3/8/2017. Small Business Cash Flow Statement due by 3/8/2017. Small Business Statement of Operations due by 3/8/2017. Small Business Tax Return due by 3/8/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. 11 U.S.C. § 329 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2016(b) (Official Form 2030) due 3/15/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 3/15/2017. Schedule A/B due 3/15/2017. Schedule D due 3/15/2017. Schedule E/F due 3/15/2017. Schedule G due 3/15/2017. Schedule H due 3/15/2017. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 3/15/2017. List of Equity Security Holders due 3/15/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 3/15/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 3/15/2017. (aac) |