USA TECHNOLOGIES, INC. v. ON TRACK INNOVATIONS LTD. et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Nitza I Quinones Alejandr |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00946 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 02, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 28, 2017 5:58 AM EDT |
Defendant
ON TRACK INNOVATIONS LTD.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OTI AMERICA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only Party
MASTERWORK ELECTRONICS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)
Thu 11/02 4:09 PM
ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES. TO CONFORM TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41.1(b), THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO ENTER THIS ORDER AND TO MARK THIS CASE CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ALL OUTSTANDING MOTIONS ARE DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 11/2/17. 11/2/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 09/27 8:58 AM
Minute Entry for Settlement Conference held on 9/26/17 before Judge Sitarski. (mbh, ) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Mon 09/25 9:52 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel of JOHN CRAIG CRAWFORD on behalf of MASTERWORK ELECTRONICS, INC., Certificate of Service.(mbh, ) |
|
25 | 25
minutes
Settlement Conference
Fri 09/22 1:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI Settlement Conference held on 9/22/17. (jl, ) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 09/20 9:48 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI Settlement Conference held on 9/19/17. (jaa, ) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
minutes
Settlement Conference
Fri 09/15 4:34 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI Settlement Conference held on 9/15/17. (jl, ) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/31 4:02 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by MASTERWORK ELECTRONICS, INC..(LURIO, MARGARET) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
21 | 21
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Thu 08/31 3:57 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against ON TRACK INNOVATIONS LTD. by USA TECHNOLOGIES, INC..(LURIO, MARGARET) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
Wed 08/23 9:27 AM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE IS GRANTED. THE CIVIL ACTIONS 17-946 AND 17-3338 ARE CONSOLIDATED FOR ALL PURPOSES UNDER CIVIL ACTION 17-946. ALL FURTHER FILINGS WILL BE MADE IN CIVIL ACTION 17-946. ALL ORDERS BY THE USDC FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA RELATED TO SCHEDULING OR DISPUTE RESOLUTION ENTERED IN CIVIL ACTION 17-3338 ARE VACATED. THE 7/27/17 SCHEUDLING ORDER AND THE 8/3/17 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER PREVIOUSLY ENTERED ON THE DOCKET OF CIVIL ACTION NO 17-946 APPLY TO ALL PARTIES NOW IN CIVIL ACTION 17-946. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 8/22/17. 8/23/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 08/11 12:47 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by USA TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (LURIO, MARGARET) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Consolidate Cases
Thu 08/10 3:57 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by ON TRACK INNOVATIONS LTD., OTI AMERICA, INC..Certificate of Service.(PRISELAC, JESSICA) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 08/08 9:35 AM
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 9/15/17 AT 9:30 AM IN COURTROOM 3-E. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 8/7/17. 8/8/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 08/04 9:45 AM
ORDER THAT THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO BE HELD ON 9/15/17 AT 9:30 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 8/3/17. 8/4/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 07/28 9:34 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 3/1/17. ANY DISPOSITIVE MOTION SHALL BE FILED BY 5/1/18. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 7/27/17. 7/28/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) |
|
14 | 14
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Fri 07/28 9:08 AM
Minute Entry for Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 7/27/17 before Judge Quinones. (mbh, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Proposed Case Management Plan
Tue 07/18 12:19 PM
Proposed Case Management Plan by USA TECHNOLOGIES, INC..(LURIO, MARGARET) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Thu 07/13 11:11 AM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ROBERT A. TRODELLA, ESQUIRE, IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 7/13/2017. 7/13/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED W/ECF APP AND E-MAILED.(ahf) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Wed 07/12 4:17 PM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert A. Trodella by ON TRACK INNOVATIONS LTD., OTI AMERICA, INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12187859.). (PRISELAC, JESSICA) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/12 4:01 PM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert A. Trodella by ON TRACK INNOVATIONS LTD., OTI AMERICA, INC... (PRISELAC, JESSICA) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE WITH PAYMENT) Modified on 7/12/2017 (nd, ) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 05/08 12:59 PM
ORDER THAT A PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 7/27/17 AT 3:00 PM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 5/8/17. 5/8/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/08 11:11 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by ON TRACK INNOVATIONS LTD..(PRISELAC, JESSICA) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/24 2:40 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by OTI AMERICA, INC..(PRISELAC, JESSICA) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 03/27 3:56 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Acceptance of Service re: served Complaint upon On Track Innovations Ltd. by Acceptance of Service on 03/17/2017(LURIO, MARGARET) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Setting Answer Deadline
Thu 03/23 10:06 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS ON TRACK INNOVATIONS LTD. AND OTI AMERICA, INC'S DEADLINE TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO 4/24/17. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 3/22/17. 3/23/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
Mon 03/20 10:04 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including On Track Innovations Ltd. with Certificate of Service by ON TRACK INNOVATIONS LTD., OTI AMERICA, INC..(PRISELAC, JESSICA) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/17 3:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA TECHNOLOGIES, INC. re: Jane Nunn served Summons and Complaint upon OTI AMERICA, INC. by Personal Service. OTI AMERICA, INC. served on 3/3/2017, answer due 3/24/2017. (LURIO, MARGARET) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 (COURT ONLY)
Wed 03/01 3:22 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by USA TECHNOLOGIES, INC..(jwl, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/01 3:21 PM
COMPLAINT against ON TRACK INNOVATIONS LTD., OTI AMERICA, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 155648.), filed by USA TECHNOLOGIES, INC..(jwl, ) |
|
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/01 3:22 PM
Summons Issued as to ON TRACK INNOVATIONS LTD., OTI AMERICA, INC.. Two Forwarded To: Counsel on 3/1/17 (jwl, ) |