Shelbi Hindel, et al v. Jon Husted
Original Case: 2:15-cv-03061
Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-03207 |
Type | civil / united states as party / federal question |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Case Filed: | Mar 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 15, 2017 2:27 AM CST |
Amicus Curiae
NATIONAL DISABILITY RIGHTS NETWORK
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
ACLU OF OHIO
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
ACLU OF KENTUCKY
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
ACLU OF MICHIGAN
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
ACLU OF TENNESSEE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
DISABILITY RIGHTS TENNESSEE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
KENTUCKY PROTECTION AND ADVOCACY
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
MICHIGAN PROTECTION AND ADVOCACY SERVICE, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JON HUSTED, Ohio Secretary of State
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SHELBI HINDEL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
BARBARA PIERCE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARIANNE DENNING
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
THE NATIONAL FEDERATION OF THE BLIND, INC.
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 13 2017
OPINION and JUDGMENT filed : REVERSED and REMANDED. Decision for publication. Richard F. Suhrheinrich, Richard Allen Griffin (AUTHORING), and Raymond M. Kethledge, Circuit Judges. |
Docket last updated: 11/15/2017 2:27 AM CST |