New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Ann M Donnelly
Referred: Ramon E Reyes, Jr
Case #: 1:17-cv-01243
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2017
Terminated:Sep 15, 2017
Last checked: Thursday Aug 31, 2017 5:48 AM EDT
Defendant
Raw Sugar Brooklyn, LLC
Represented By
Jamie Haar
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Misty D. Marris
Gordon & Rees
contact info
Defendant
Diane Veneski
Represented By
Jamie Haar
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Misty D. Marris
Gordon & Rees
contact info
Plaintiff
Sam Lopez
Represented By
Tara Demetriades
Ada Accessibility Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago
Friday, September 15, 2017
order Order Dismissing Case Fri 09/15 3:16 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 9/15/2017. (Greene, Donna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2017
16 16 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 09/14 10:28 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by Sam Lopez (Demetriades, Tara)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 09/14 9:26 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by Sam Lopez (Demetriades, Tara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2017
order Scheduling Order Tue 09/05 11:08 AM
Order re:14 Notice of Settlement. The parties stipulation of dismissal was due by 8/28/2017. As of yet no stipulation has been filed. The parties are instructed to file their stipulation of dismissal no later than 9/18/2017.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 9/5/2017. (Naidich, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2017
order Order(Other) ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 07/21 11:21 AM
ORDER re14 Notice of Settlement filed by Sam Lopez. The parties' Stipulation of Dismissal is due by 8/28/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 7/21/2017. (Vertus, Miriam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2017
14 14 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 07/13 5:01 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Sam Lopez (Demetriades, Tara)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2017
minutes Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 06/05 12:43 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr.:Telephone Conference held on 6/5/2017. Appearances: Tara Demetriades, Esq., for Plaintiff; Jamie Haar, Esq., for Defendants. Discussions Held. Defendants' Answer due by 7/14/2017. No further extensions will be granted. (Tape #12:33:34-12:38:48 (208N).) (Naidich, Zachary)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 06/05 2:58 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for All Defendants Extension of Time to Answer by 7/14/17, as discussed at the 6/6/2017 telephone conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 6/5/2017. (Vertus, Miriam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2017
order Scheduling Order Thu 06/01 8:22 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re13 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint. Telephone Conference set for 6/5/2017 at 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Defendant's counsel to initiate the call and dial in chambers once all parties are on the line. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 5/31/2017. (Vertus, Miriam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2017
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 05/31 11:01 AM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, thirty (30) days after the disposition of the instant application by Raw Sugar Brooklyn, LLC, Diane Veneski. (Haar, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2017
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/24 5:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Misty D. Marris on behalf of Diane Veneski (aty to be noticed) (Marris, Misty)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/24 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Haar on behalf of Diane Veneski (aty to be noticed) (Haar, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2017
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/18 10:58 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sam Lopez. Diane Veneski served on 3/22/2017, answer due 4/12/2017. (Demetriades, Tara)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2017
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 05/01 11:14 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, by Raw Sugar Brooklyn, LLC. (Haar, Jamie)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 05/01 12:32 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Defendant Raw Sugar Brooklyn, LLC Extension of Time to Answer answer due 5/31/2017. No further extensions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 5/1/2017. (Vertus, Miriam)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2017
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 04/17 9:58 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Defendant Raw Sugar Brooklyn, LLC Extension of Time to Answer by 5/3/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 4/14/2017. (Vertus, Miriam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2017
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/13 5:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Misty D. Marris on behalf of Raw Sugar Brooklyn, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Marris, Misty)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 04/13 5:11 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, thirty (30) days after the disposition of the instant application by Raw Sugar Brooklyn, LLC. (Haar, Jamie)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/13 5:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Haar on behalf of Raw Sugar Brooklyn, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Haar, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2017
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/24 10:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sam Lopez. Raw Sugar Brooklyn, LLC served on 3/11/2017, answer due 4/3/2017. (Demetriades, Tara)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2017
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 03/06 1:14 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 03/06 1:13 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 03/06 1:13 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Diane summons
Saturday, March 04, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 03/04 10:05 PM
COMPLAINT against Raw Sugar Brooklyn, LLC, Diane Veneski filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9340372 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Sam Lopez. (Demetriades, Tara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/06 12:48 PM
Case assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]