Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Eleanor L Ross
Case #: 1:17-cv-00779
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2017
Terminated:Jul 24, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 30, 2017 5:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Cobb County Police
Defendant
R. B. Latham
Defendant
J. N. Vogel
Plaintiff
Little G. Stone
1401 East Ninth St.
West Point, GA 31833


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, January 28, 2022
7 7 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Filing Restriction Fri 01/28 1:35 PM
ORDER: Since Plaintiff continues to burden the Court with frivolous filings, his filing restriction will be further extended. Plaintiff shall be barred from filing any document in his existing cases without first posting a frivolity bond in the amount of $250. Plaintiff must also include an affidavit as to the relevancy of the proposed filing.The Clerk is DIRECTED to immediately return to Plaintiff any proposed filing that does not comply with this expanded filing restriction. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to docket this order in all cases listed in the footnote. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 1/28/22. (ceo)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 01/28 1:35 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Little G. Stone re7 Order. (ceo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
6 6 2 pgs order Order Tue 01/18 2:32 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff shall be barred, unless first granted permission by the Court, from filing any more documents in this matter as well as any previously filed matter before the Northern District of Georgia. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to submit any future proposed filing for the Courts consideration prior to actually filing the document on the Court docket. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 1/18/2022. (vs)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 01/18 2:47 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Little G. Stone re6 Order. (vs)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2017
5 5 misc Judgment - Clerk Mon 07/24 2:44 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing this action without prejudice. (cmd)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Order to Dismiss Mon 07/24 2:40 PM
ORDER: To date, Plaintiff has not complied with the Court's Order [Doc.3 ], nor is there any indication that Defendants have been served. Accordingly, the Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE this case and DIRECTS the Clerk to close this action. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 7/24/2017. (cmd)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 07/24 2:48 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Little G. Stone re4 Order to Dismiss and5 Clerk's Judgment. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (cmd)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 07/24 2:49 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2017
utility Submission to District Judge Fri 06/30 11:21 AM
Submission of3 Order to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2017
3 3 order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Mon 06/12 8:02 AM
ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to show either that service has in fact been properly made or why plaintiff has been unable to serve Defendants. Plaintiff's failure to make such a showing will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 6/9/17. (jpa)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 06/12 8:03 AM
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Little G. Stone re3 Order. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (jpa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2017
2 2 order Order Tue 03/07 9:10 AM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 03/07 9:16 AM
Clerks Certificate of Mailing to Little G. Stone as to Little G. Stone regarding2 Order. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/06 4:40 PM
COMPLAINT, filed by Little G. Stone. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 90735.)(eop)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet