Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Algenon L Marbley
Referred: Kimberly A Jolson
Case #: 2:17-cv-00195
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2017
Terminated:Jul 28, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 30, 2017 5:43 AM EDT
Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson
Judge Algenon L. Marbley
Defendant
Belmont County Board of Commissioners
101 West Main Street
St. Clairsville, OH 43950
Represented By
Molly R Gwin
Isaac, Wiles, Burkholder & Teetor, LLC
contact info
Jeffrey Alan Stankunas
Isaac Wiles Burkholder & Teetor, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Belmont County Department of Job & Family Services
Represented By
Molly R Gwin
Isaac, Wiles, Burkholder & Teetor, LLC
contact info
Jeffrey Alan Stankunas
Isaac Wiles Burkholder & Teetor, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lisa Fijalkowski
438 West 43rd St.
Shadyside, OH 43947
Represented By
Elizabeth Tuck Loring
Loring Law Office, LLC
contact info
Elizabeth S Loring
Loring Law Office, LLC
contact info

GPO Jul 20 2017
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/20/2017. (ew)
GPO Apr 18 2018
ORDER sustaining21Objection to Magistrate Judge Order, OVERRULING [Doc. 18] Order Denying Motion to Amend, and GRANTING Plaintiff Leave to Amend her Complaint. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 4/18/2018. (cw)
GPO May 17 2021
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion for Summary Judgment; the Court hereby DISMISSES Count Three of the Amended Complaint. DENYING 78 MOTION to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 5/17/2021. (cw)
GPO Jul 28 2021
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice, the parties shall file their notice of dismissal, dismissing this case with prejudice no later than 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 7/28/2021. (cw)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
89 89 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 09/29 3:31 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Notice and Stipulation With Prejudice by Defendants Belmont County Board of Commissioners, Belmont County Department of Job & Family Services. (Gwin, Molly)
Related: [-]