Idaho District Court
Judge:B Lynn Winmill
Case #: 1:17-cv-00098
Nature of Suit535 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Death Penalty
Cause28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 23, 2017 3:53 AM MDT
Petitioner
Azad Haji Abdullah
Represented By
Jonah Horwitz
Federal Defender Services Of Idaho Inc
contact info
Bruce D Livingston
Federal Defender'S Office
contact info
Samuel Richard Rubin
Federal Defender Services Of Idaho
contact info
Respondent
Al Ramirez
Represented By
L LaMont Anderson
Office Of Attorney General
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Monday, December 23, 2024
notice Notice of Case Number Change Mon 12/23 9:32 AM
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Senior Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:17-cv-00098-BLW. (jd)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
69 69 6 pgs order Order of Recusal Mon 12/16 3:25 PM
ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION OF RECUSAL NOTICE - the Respondents request for reconsideration is DENIED, and the Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign this case. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
Related: [-]