California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 2:17-cv-01794
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2017
Last checked: Saturday Sep 02, 2017 2:18 AM PDT
Defendant
Clarus Commerce LLC
Represented By
John D Freed
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Scott R Commerson
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Christine M Reilly
Manatt Phelps And Phillips LLP
contact info
Joseph E Addiego, III
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Raymond D. Chandler
Represented By
James L Hudgens
James L Hudgens Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Luann Shaver
Represented By
James L Hudgens
James L Hudgens Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, November 10, 2017
42 42 stip Dismiss Case Fri 11/10 2:15 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to F.R.C.P.41(a)(1)(A)(II) filed by defendant Clarus Commerce LLC.(Commerson, Scott)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2017
41 41 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 09/27 11:51 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Howard Loring Rose counsel for Defendant Clarus Commerce LLC. Adding Howard Loring Rose as counsel of record for CLARUS COMMERCE, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant CLARUS COMMERCE, LLC. (Attorney Howard Loring Rose added to party Clarus Commerce LLC(pty:dft))(Rose, Howard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2017
40 40 order Protective Order Wed 09/20 2:54 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick re Stipulation for Protective Order39 . (sp)
Related: [-]
39 39 stip Protective Order Wed 09/20 9:55 AM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Clarus Commerce LLC.(Commerson, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 12, 2017
38 38 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Tue 09/12 2:48 PM
CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2017
37 37 2 pgs order Order Tue 08/29 1:45 PM
ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL REGARDING THE EXISTENCE OF ARBITRATION AGREEMENT TO ALLOW FOR EXPERT DISCOVERY36 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: DENIED by Order of the Court. (cr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2017
36 36 stip Continue Thu 08/24 4:15 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Trial from November 28, 2017 to January 30, 2018 Re: Order on Motion to Compel Arbitration,,, Motion Hearing,,, Set/Reset Hearing,,35 filed by Defendant Clarus Commerce LLC.(Commerson, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration In Support of Stipulation to Continue Trial,
Att: 2 Proposed Order To Continue Trial
Monday, July 31, 2017
35 35 minutes Motion Hearing Compel Arbitration ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 08/02 10:16 AM
MINUTES OF MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Clarus Commerce LLC Hearing held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson re:22 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. The motion to compel arbitration is submitted. The parties will be given 90 days from the issuance of this order to conduct discovery. A trial is set on the motion to compel for November 28, 2017, at 9:00 am. The parties are already aware that briefing and discovery on the motion for class certification is stayed until the motion to compel arbitration is decided. If the motion to compel arbitration is denied, the Court will set a briefing schedule on the motion for class certification. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2017
34 34 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 07/17 5:10 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration22 and to Stay Action filed by Defendant Clarus Commerce LLC. (Addiego, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 03, 2017
33 33 order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Mon 07/03 2:25 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REPLY PAPERS FILING DEADLINE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, re Stipulation to Continue,31 . The July 17, 2017 hearing on Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration (Dkt. No. 22), shall be continued to July 31, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 10A; Clarus' deadline to file its reply papers in support of the Arbitration Motion shall be extended to July 17, 2017, in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-10; SO ORDERED. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
32 32 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) Mon 07/03 11:49 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The document is accepted as filed. The Clerk shall correct the docket entry to read, "Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration." (cr)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2017
31 31 stip Continue Fri 06/30 3:43 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion To Compel Arbitration from July 17, 2017 to July 31, 2017 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration22 filed by Defendant Clarus Commerce LLC.(Addiego, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation Continuing Hearing on Defendant's Motion To Compel Arbitration Deadline and Reply Papers Filing
30 30 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) Fri 06/30 11:04 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration28 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to amend NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration28 29 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Objection/Opposition (Motion related). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2017
29 29 motion Amend/Correct Thu 06/29 3:53 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to amend NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration28 filed by plaintiff Raymond D. Chandler. Motion set for hearing on 7/17/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Hudgens, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
28 28 motion Compel Arbitration Thu 06/29 3:31 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by PLAINITFF Raymond D. Chandler. Motion set for hearing on 7/17/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Hudgens, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Declaration
Thursday, June 22, 2017
27 27 order Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings Fri 06/23 10:48 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION CONTINUING CLASS CERTIFICATION PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, re Stipulation to Continue,24 . The July 17, 2017 hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Dkt. No. 23), as well as all further briefing on the Plaintiffs' Motion, shall be continued until such time as the Court has ruled on Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration (Dkt. No. 22); (see document for details). (mrgo)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Order Substitution of Attorney -- GRANTED Fri 06/23 10:25 AM
ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, re Notice (Other)25 . Attorney Scott R. Commerson substituted in place and stead of attorney Christine M Reilly for defendant Clarus Commerce LLC. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2017
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Wed 06/21 1:41 PM
NOTICE of Request For Approval Of Substitution of Counsel filed by Defendant Clarus Commerce LLC.(Commerson, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Approving Request for Substitution
Thursday, June 15, 2017
24 24 stip Continue Thu 06/15 6:25 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Class Certification Proceedings from July 17, 2017 to Until after such time as the court has ruled on the Arbitration Motion Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class 23 filed by Defendant Clarus Commerce LLC.(Commerson, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Scott R. Commerson In Support of Stipulation to Continue Proceedings,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation Continuing Class Certification Proceedings
Tuesday, June 13, 2017
23 23 motion Certify Class Action Tue 06/13 12:42 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class filed by plaintiff Raymond D. Chandler. Motion set for hearing on 7/17/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Hudgens, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Declaration,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Friday, June 02, 2017
22 22 motion Compel Arbitration Fri 06/02 2:20 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Clarus Commerce LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/17/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Addiego, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Joseph E. Addiego III; Exhibits 1-2,
Att: 2 Declaration of Rhiannon Hermann; Exhibits A-J,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action
21 21 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 06/02 1:09 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Clarus Commerce LLC, identifying no other interested parties. (Addiego, Joseph)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 06/02 1:05 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 filed by Defendant Clarus Commerce LLC identifying No parent corporation. as Corporate Parent. (Addiego, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2017
19 19 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Wed 05/17 2:06 PM
ORDER ON STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT18 By Judge Stephen V. Wilson. It is hereby ordered that the due date for Defendant Clams Commerce, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint is extended from May 18, 2017 to June 2, 2017. (lom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2017
18 18 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 05/16 10:36 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Clarus Commerce LLC answer now due 6/2/2017, re Amended Complaint/Petition,17 filed by Defendant Clarus Commerce LLC.(Attorney Joseph E Addiego, III added to party Clarus Commerce LLC(pty:dft))(Addiego, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint
Thursday, May 04, 2017
17 17 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Thu 05/04 11:59 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT Raymond D. Chandler amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)10 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)9 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),2 , filed by Plaintiff Raymond D. Chandler(Hudgens, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Other case complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Internet pages,
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration re CLRA Notice
Tuesday, April 04, 2017
16 16 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Tue 04/04 4:34 PM
ORDER ON STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less),15 . It is hereby ordered that the due date for defendant Clarus Commerce, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended from 4/5/17 to 5/5/17. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2017
15 15 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Fri 03/31 4:08 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Clarus Commerce LLC answer now due 5/5/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),2 filed by Defendant Clarus Commerce LLC.(Attorney Christine M Reilly added to party Clarus Commerce LLC(pty:dft)) Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Christine
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint
Monday, March 27, 2017
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 03/27 10:15 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Raymond D. Chandler, upon Defendant Clarus Commerce LLC served on 3/15/2017, answer due 4/5/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service agent for service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hudgens, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2017
13 13 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 03/09 2:12 PM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) Thu 03/09 11:04 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)10 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)9 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event for doc. no. 9 is Civil Cover Sheet. The correct event for doc. no. 10 is Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/09 11:02 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),2 as to Defendant Clarus Commerce LLC. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2017
10 10 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 03/08 5:09 PM
COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 03/06/2017, receipt number 2613UFUS), filed by plaintiff Raymond D. Chandler.(Hudgens, James)
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 03/08 5:05 PM
COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 03/06/17, receipt number 2613UFUS), filed by plaintiff Raymond D. Chandler.(Hudgens, James)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Summons Request Wed 03/08 4:56 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),2 filed by plaintiff Raymond D. Chandler. (Hudgens, James)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Deficiency in Summons Wed 03/08 3:39 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request5 . The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Wed 03/08 3:38 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),2 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Summons Request Wed 03/08 3:34 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),2 filed by plaintiff Raymond D. Chandler. (Hudgens, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 03/08 3:29 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 03/08 3:29 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 03/08 10:12 AM
COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 03/06/2017, receipt number 0973-19468276 [2613UFUS] ), filed by plaintiff Raymond D. Chandler. (Attorney James L Hudgens added to party Raymond D. Chandler(pty:pla))(Hudgens, James) Modified on 3/8/2017 (et)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit prior action,
Att: 2 Exhibit internet pages,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Wed 03/08 7:23 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: You have attempted to open this case electronically but have failed to upload successfully the required PDF version of any initiating document, such as a complaint or notice of removal. You must file an initiating document within two business days of this notice or the docket for this case number will be closed. [bcc:jlh@jlhudgenslaw.com] (et)
Related: [-]