Adigitek LLC
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-01357 |
Case Filed: | Mar 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 27, 2018 |
Debtor
Adigitek LLC
316 S Rangeline Rd Ste C
Carmel, IN 46032-2170 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Gregory K. Silver
Office of Gregory K. Silver 334 N. Senate Avenue
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 03/09/2017 12:02 AM EST |
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Wed 03/08 11:42 AM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition 17-01357 JJG-7) [misc,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 26961141. Fee amount 335.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition
Wed 03/08 11:40 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (Non-Individual) with Corporate Ownership Statement, Statement of Financial Affairs, Schedule(s) A/B, D, E/F, G and H, Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Attorney Disclosure of Compensation and Verification of Creditor List filed by John T McManus on behalf of Adigitek LLC. Income & Expense Schedule due by 03/22/2017. (McManus, John) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Income & Expense Statement
Wed 03/08 11:54 AM
Income & Expense Statement filed by John T McManus on behalf of Debtor Adigitek LLC. (McManus, John) |