A Plus Affordable Roofing, LLC
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Barbara J Houser |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-30905 |
Case Filed: | Mar 08, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 27, 2018 |
Debtor
A Plus Affordable Roofing, LLC
101 W Eubank St
Mabank, TX 75147-8350 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Jeffrey H. Mims
Founders Square, Suite 560 900 Jackson Street
Dallas, TX 75202 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242 |
Docket last updated: 03/09/2017 12:03 AM CST |
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
court
Meeting of creditors 7 bus. no asset - AutoAssign
Wed 03/08 4:16 PM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 04/18/2017 at 09:50 AM at Dallas 341 Rm 524. (Coffman, Kathryn) |
||
crditcrd
none
Wed 03/08 4:21 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (case upload) 17-30905 7) [caseupld,1027u] ( 335.00). Receipt number 23415359, amount $ 335.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
caseupld
Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 (case upload)
Wed 03/08 4:15 PM
Non-Individual Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (case upload) filed by Kathryn G. Coffman on behalf of A Plus Affordable Roofing, LLC. (Coffman, Kathryn) |
|
2 | 2
caseupld
Certificate of credit counseling (case upload)
Wed 03/08 4:16 PM
Certificate of credit counseling filed by Kathryn G. Coffman on behalf of A Plus Affordable Roofing, LLC. (Coffman, Kathryn) |