|
GPO
Feb 04 2014
ORDER GRANTING re 10 Stipulation For Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/4/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
|
|
GPO
Mar 11 2014
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/11/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
|
|
GPO
Sep 05 2014
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING MEDIATION DEADLINE TO 10/2/14. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/5/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
|
|
GPO
Sep 11 2014
ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/11/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
|
|
GPO
Nov 26 2014
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Establish Trial Briefing Schedule filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Group Long Term Disability Plan For Employees of Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/26/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
|
|
GPO
Jan 05 2015
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline on Opening Trial Brief filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Group Long Term Disability Plan For Employees of Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/5/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
|
|
GPO
Jan 14 2015
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 49 Extending Deadline on Responsive Trial Brief by Ten Days filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Group Long Term Disability Plan For Employees of Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/14/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
|
|
GPO
Feb 06 2015
ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE A RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/6/15. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
|
|
GPO
Mar 06 2015
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 60 Motion to Appear by Telephone Defendants' Request to Appear by Telephone at Further Case Management Conference. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
|
|
GPO
Apr 23 2015
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 67 Stipulation for Deadline for Filing of Opposition to Plaintiff's Post Hearing Brief in Support of Admission of Social Security Disability Award. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
|
|
GPO
Jun 02 2015
ORDER REGARDING SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION DETERMINATION. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/2/2015. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
|
|
GPO
Jun 26 2015
Order by Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr granting 75 Stipulation.(hsglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2015)
|
|
GPO
Sep 14 2015
ORDER REGARDING SELECTION OF AN INDEPENDENT EXPERT. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/14/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
|
|
GPO
Sep 30 2015
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 82 Defendants' Request to Appear by Telephone at October 13, 2015 Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
|
|
GPO
Apr 22 2016
ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/22/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
|
|
GPO
May 24 2016
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 91 Stipulation for Extension to Submit a Proposed Judgment re Disability Benefits and Prejudgment Interest. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
|
|
GPO
Jun 09 2016
JUDGMENT. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/9/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
|
|
GPO
Jul 11 2016
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 101 Stipulation for 45-day Extension to Determine whether Nagy is Entitled to Benefits under the "Any Occupation" Standard of the Hartford Disability Policy. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
|
|
GPO
Sep 07 2016
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 104 APPROVAL OF CASH DEPOSIT IN LIEU OF BOND; GRANTING 111 MOTION FOR REVIEW OF TAXATION OF COSTS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
|
|
GPO
Oct 04 2016
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 129 Stipulation TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
|
|
GPO
Oct 19 2016
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 135 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
|
|
GPO
Oct 26 2016
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 126 Motion to Relate Case to 16-cv-5309-DMR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2016)
|
|
GPO
Jan 17 2017
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 97 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Dave Nagy, 123 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion for Attorney's Fees filed by Dave Nagy. The undersigned recommends that the presiding district judge grant the plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees, but reduce the amount requested and, in the end, award the plaintiff a total of $245,305.50 in attorney's fees.Objections due by 1/31/2017. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/17/2017. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
|
|
GPO
Feb 23 2017
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGES 146 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE: 123 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS 150 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
|
|
GPO
Apr 06 2017
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 156 Stipulation to Post Supersedeas Bond. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
|
|
GPO
Aug 09 2018
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 168 Defendants' Motion to Appear by Telephone at the August 14, 2018 Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582- 6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
|
|
GPO
Aug 22 2018
ORDER REGARDING RECALCULATION OF ATTORNEYS FEES. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/22/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
|
|
GPO
Aug 22 2018
ORDER REGARDING JUDGMENT FOR OWN OCCUPATION BENEFITS. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/22/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
|
|
GPO
Sep 06 2018
Amended 173 Order RE JUDGMENT FOR OWN OCCUPATION BENEFITS. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/6/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
|