National Environmental Fiberglass, LLC
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Scott H Yun |
Case #: | 6:17-bk-11833 |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 25, 2018 |
Debtor
National Environmental Fiberglass, LLC
9444 Cassia Rd
Adelanto, CA 92301-3938 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Karl T Anderson (TR)
340 South Farrell Drive, Suite A210
Palm Springs, CA 92262 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501 |
Docket last updated: 03/10/2017 12:02 AM PST |
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 03/09 4:53 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(6:17-bk-11833) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 44391429. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC)
Thu 03/09 4:54 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 04/11/2017 at 10:00 AM at RM 103, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. (Wade, Stephen) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Thu 03/09 4:50 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by National Environmental Fiberglass, LLC (Wade, Stephen) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1)
Thu 03/09 4:51 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor National Environmental Fiberglass, LLC. (Wade, Stephen) |