Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-11117

Rhode Island Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Diane Finkle
Case #: 1:17-ap-01007
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2017
Terminated:Oct 16, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
420 Montgomery Street
San Francisco, CA 94104
Represented By
Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
contact info
Plaintiff
Carrie Laudone
108 Church Street
Bradford, RI 02808
Represented By
Christopher Lefebvre
Law Office Of Claude Lefebvre & Sons
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Monday, October 16, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Mon 10/16 10:37 AM
Adversary Case Closed . . (Sweeney, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2017
35 35 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 09/29 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 09/28/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)34 Order Dismissing Case
Tuesday, September 26, 2017
34 34 order Dismissing Case Tue 09/26 11:58 AM
Order Dismissing Case - Stipulated Dismissal. Appeals/Motion for Reconsideration Due by: 10/10/2017, plus an additional 3 days if served by mail or otherwise allowed under FRBP 9006(f). (Ricciarelli, Pam)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Tue 09/26 9:21 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Christopher Lefebvre on behalf of Carrie Laudone Related [+]. (Lefebvre, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Carrie Laudone
court Hearing Not Held Tue 09/26 11:57 AM
Hearing Not Held Related [+]. **Matter removed from Calendar as Stipulated Dismissal filed. (Ricciarelli, Pam)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage,13 Response filed by Plaintiff Carrie Laudone
Thursday, August 31, 2017
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 09/01 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 08/31/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)31 Order on Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing
Tuesday, August 29, 2017
31 31 order Continue Hearing Tue 08/29 11:33 AM
Order Granting30 Motion To Continue/Reschedule Hearing On Related [+]. This matter is rescheduled as a pre-trial conference for 9/27/2017 at 10:30 AM at 6th Floor Courtroom. See order for details. (DAgostino, Holly)
Related: [-] 30 9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage,13 Response/Motion to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff Carrie Laudone
30 30 motion Continue Hearing Tue 08/29 11:15 AM
Joint Motion to Continue Hearing . See Local Bankruptcy Rules 5005-4(n)(2) and 5071-1 for Objection period. Filed by Plaintiff Carrie Laudone, Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Related [+]. If this is an Emergency Motion, the objection deadline will not apply and a new deadline will be set by the court. See Local Bankruptcy Rule 9013-2(e)(3).(Lefebvre, Christopher)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage,13 Response filed by Plaintiff Carrie Laudone,28 Order on Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing
Thursday, August 17, 2017
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 08/18 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 08/17/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)28 Order on Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing
Tuesday, August 15, 2017
28 28 order Continue Hearing Tue 08/15 9:56 AM
Order Granting Motion To Continue/Reschedule Hearing On Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 8/30/2017 at 10:30 AM at 6th Floor Courtroom. (DAgostino, Holly)
Related: [-] 27 9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage,13 Response/Motion to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff Carrie Laudone
Monday, August 14, 2017
27 27 motion Continue Hearing Mon 08/14 3:25 PM
Joint Motion to Continue Hearing . See Local Bankruptcy Rules 5005-4(n)(2) and 5071-1 for Objection period. Filed by Plaintiff Carrie Laudone, Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Related [+]. If this is an Emergency Motion, the objection deadline will not apply and a new deadline will be set by the court. See Local Bankruptcy Rule 9013-2(e)(3).(Fialkow, David)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage,13 Response filed by Plaintiff Carrie Laudone
Wednesday, August 02, 2017
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 08/03 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 08/02/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)23 Hearing (Adv) Cont
Tuesday, August 01, 2017
25 25 order Continue Hearing Tue 08/01 12:29 PM
Order Granting Motion To Continue/Reschedule Hearing On Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 8/16/2017 at 10:30 AM at 6th Floor Courtroom. (DAgostino, Holly)
Related: [-] 24 9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage,13 Response/Motion to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff Carrie Laudone
24 24 motion Continue Hearing Tue 08/01 11:16 AM
Agreed Motion to Continue Hearing . See Local Bankruptcy Rules 5005-4(n)(2) and 5071-1 for Objection period. Filed by Plaintiff Carrie Laudone Related [+]. If this is an Emergency Motion, the objection deadline will not apply and a new deadline will be set by the court. See Local Bankruptcy Rule 9013-2(e)(3).(Lefebvre, Christopher)
Related: [-] 21 Hearing,23 Hearing (Adv) Cont
Monday, July 31, 2017
23 23 court Hearing Continued Mon 07/31 9:41 AM
HEARING CONTINUED AS TO TIME ONLY Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 8/2/2017 at 10:30 AM at 6th Floor Courtroom. (DAgostino, Holly)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage,13 Response filed by Plaintiff Carrie Laudone,20 Response filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Wednesday, July 12, 2017
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 07/13 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 07/12/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)21 Hearing
Monday, July 10, 2017
21 21 court Hearing Set Mon 07/10 1:00 PM
Hearing Set Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 8/2/2017 at 10:00 AM at 6th Floor Courtroom. (DAgostino, Holly)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage,13 Response/Motion to File Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Carrie Laudone,20 Response/Objection filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Monday, July 03, 2017
20 20 answer Response Mon 07/03 1:36 PM
Response re13 Response filed by Plaintiff Carrie Laudone). Filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage (Mikolinski, Edward)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 11, 2017
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Mon 06/12 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 06/11/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)18 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Friday, June 09, 2017
18 18 order Extend Time Fri 06/09 11:44 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to 7/3/2017 to Respond to Motio Related [+] . Updated deadline due by: 7/3/2017. (Ricciarelli, Pam)
Related: [-] 17
17 17 motion Extend Time Fri 06/09 8:39 AM
Motion to Extend Time until 7/3/17 to Respond to Plaintiff/Debtor's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint Filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Related [+]. Status Check Due by:06/12/2017. If this is an Emergency Motion, the objection deadline will not apply and a new deadline will be set by the court. See Local Bankruptcy Rule 9013-2(e)(3).(Mikolinski, Edward)
Related: [-] 13 Response filed by Plaintiff Carrie Laudone
Thursday, June 08, 2017
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 06/09 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 06/08/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)15 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Tuesday, June 06, 2017
15 15 order Extend Time Tue 06/06 2:43 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to 6/12/2017 to Respond to Debtor's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint Related [+] . Updated deadline due by: 6/12/2017. (Ricciarelli, Pam)
Related: [-] 14
Monday, June 05, 2017
14 14 motion Extend Time Mon 06/05 4:08 PM
Motion to Extend Time until 6/12/17 to Respond to Debtor's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint Filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Related [+]. Status Check Due by:06/7/2017. If this is an Emergency Motion, the objection deadline will not apply and a new deadline will be set by the court. See Local Bankruptcy Rule 9013-2(e)(3).(Mikolinski, Edward)
Related: [-] 13 Response filed by Plaintiff Carrie Laudone
Tuesday, May 30, 2017
utility Update Objection/Response Deadline Tue 05/30 4:09 PM
Objection/Response Deadline Updated Related [+]. . Objections to Motion due: 6/5/2017, plus an additional 3 days if served by mail or otherwise allowed under FRBP 9006(f). (Sweeney, Carolyn)
Related: [-] 13 Response and Motion to Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiff Carrie Laudone
Monday, May 22, 2017
13 13 answer Response Mon 05/22 12:16 PM
Response (and Motion to file Amended Adversary Complaint) re9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage). Filed by Plaintiff Carrie Laudone (Lefebvre, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit (A-Proposed Amended Complaint w/ exhibits A-C)
Wednesday, May 10, 2017
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 05/11 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 05/10/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)11 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Monday, May 08, 2017
11 11 order Extend Time Mon 05/08 4:48 PM
Order Granting10 Motion to Extend Time to: 5/22/2017 to file response to9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. Updated deadline due by: 5/22/2017. (Davis, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extend Time Mon 05/08 12:46 PM
Motion to Extend Time until May 22, 2017 to extend the deadline to file response to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Carrie Laudone Related [+]. Status Check Due by:05/10/2017. If this is an Emergency Motion, the objection deadline will not apply and a new deadline will be set by the court. See Local Bankruptcy Rule 9013-2(e)(3).(Lefebvre, Christopher)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Monday, April 24, 2017
9 9 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 04/24 4:00 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. Objections to Motion due: 05/8/2017, plus an additional 3 days if served by mail or otherwise allowed under FRBP 9006(f). If this is an Emergency Motion, the objection deadline will not apply and a new deadline will be set by the court. See Local Bankruptcy Rule 9013-2(e)(3).(Mikolinski, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law
notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (pdf or text only) Mon 04/24 1:55 PM
TEXT ONLY Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Edward J Mikolinski on behalf of Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. (Mikolinski, Edward)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2017
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 04/21 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 04/20/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)7 Order on Motion for Expedited Determination
Tuesday, April 18, 2017
7 7 order Expedited Determination Tue 04/18 11:26 AM
Order Granting Motion for Expedited Determination to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. Related [+]. Updated Answer/Responses to1 Complaint due by: 4/24/2017. (Sweeney, Carolyn)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Expedited Determination
Friday, April 07, 2017
6 6 motion Expedited Determination Fri 04/07 12:16 PM
Motion for Expedited Determination re: Assented-to Extension of Deadline to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. Objections to Motion Due: 04/14/2017, plus an additional 3 days if served by mail or otherwise allowed under FRBP 9006(f). If this is an Emergency Motion, the objection deadline will not apply and a new deadline will be set by the court. See Local Bankruptcy Rule 9013-2(e)(3).(Fialkow, David)
Related: [-]
misc Corrective Action Required Fri 04/07 11:10 AM
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT A CORRECTIVE ACTION IS REQUIRED BY FILER - Related [+]. Rule 1005-1(d) language is incorrect on document. (Does not comply with LBR 1005-1(d)(2)(G) Solution: The filer is directed to refile the document in proper form. This document is terminated and no further action will be taken by the Court. (Sweeney, Carolyn)
Related: [-] 5 Motion for Expedited Determination filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Thursday, April 06, 2017
5 5 motion Expedited Determination Thu 04/06 5:09 PM
Motion for Expedited Determination re: Assented-to Extension of Deadline to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. Objections to Motion Due: 04/13/2017, plus an additional 3 days if served by mail or otherwise allowed under FRBP 9006(f). If this is an Emergency Motion, the objection deadline will not apply and a new deadline will be set by the court. See Local Bankruptcy Rule 9013-2(e)(3).(Fialkow, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 03/10 5:08 PM
Summons Service Executed on Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Court will set Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Deadlines if applicable.. Status Check Due by:03/13/2017. (Lefebvre, Christopher)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Fri 03/10 3:05 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Carrie Laudone. (Lefebvre, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 03/10 12:06 PM
Summons Issued on Wells Fargo Home Mortgage[LINK:Summons Issued] (Lefebvre, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 03/10 12:06 PM
Adversary case 1:17-ap-01007. (91 (Declaratory judgment)): Complaint by Carrie Laudone, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage against Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Answer Due by: 04/10/2017. U.S. Governmental Agency Answer due by 04/14/2017. (Lefebvre, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Form Cover Sheet
misc Corrective Action Required Fri 03/10 4:37 PM
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT A CORRECTIVE ACTION IS REQUIRED BY FILER - Related [+]. Incorrect event used. Please use the event "Summons Service Executed" located under "Complaint, Summons & Amended Answer" on the "Adversary" menu. Solution: The filer is directed to refile the document in proper form. This document is terminated and no further action will be taken by the Court.. . (Sweeney, Carolyn)
Related: [-] 3 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Carrie Laudone3 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Carrie Laudone
utility Set Discovery Plan and Sched Order Tue 03/14 1:09 PM
Discovery Plan and Sched Order Deadlines set Related [+]. Discovery Plan Due by: 6/1/2017. Issue Scheduling Order on: 6/8/2017. (Sweeney, Carolyn)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Carrie Laudone