Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Elizabeth A Kovachevich
Referred: Anthony E Porcelli
Case #: 8:17-cv-00587
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2017
Last checked: Saturday Mar 11, 2017 3:31 AM EST
Defendant
Drummond Company, Inc.
Plaintiff
John J. Jerue
Represented By
Neal L. O'Toole
Lilly, O'Toole & Brown, LLP
contact info

Docket last updated: 16 minutes ago
Monday, March 20, 2017
6 6 order Order on motion to appear pro hac vice Mon 6:13 PM
ORDER granting 5 motion to appear pro hac vice. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 3/20/2017. (JMF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2017
misc Pro Hac Vice Fees paid Tue 2:48 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney W. Mark Lanier, appearing on behalf of John J. Jerue (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA042361) Related document:5 MOTION for W. Mark Lanier to appear pro hac vice. (LMD)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Hac Vice Fees paid Tue 3:35 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Richard D. Meadow, appearing on behalf of John J. Jerue (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA042361) Related document:5 MOTION for Richard D. Meadow to appear pro hac vice. (LMD)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Hac Vice Fees paid Tue 3:36 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Christopher L. Gadoury, appearing on behalf of John J. Jerue (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA042361.) Related document:5 MOTION for Christopher L. Gadoury,to appear pro hac vice. (LMD)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Hac Vice Fees paid Tue 3:38 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Ryan D. Ellis, appearing on behalf of John J. Jerue (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA042361) Related document:5 MOTION for Ryan D. Ellis appear pro hac vice. (LMD)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Hac Vice Fees paid Tue 3:39 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Christopher T. Nidel, appearing on behalf of John J. Jerue (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA042361.) Related document:5 MOTION for Christopher T. Nidel to appear pro hac vice. (LMD)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Hac Vice Fees paid Tue 3:41 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Jonathan Nace, appearing on behalf of John J. Jerue (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA042361.) Related document:5 MOTION for Jonathan Nace to appear pro hac vice. (LMD)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Hac Vice Fees paid Tue 3:46 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Thomas V. Girardi, appearing on behalf of John J. Jerue (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA042361.) Related document:5 MOTION for Thomas V. Girardi to appear pro hac vice. (LMD)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Hac Vice Fees paid Tue 3:53 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Joel M. Rubenstein, appearing on behalf of John J. Jerue (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA042361) Related document:5 MOTION for Joel M. Rubenstein to appear pro hac vice. (LMD)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Hac Vice Fees paid Tue 3:55 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Steven J German, appearing on behalf of John J. Jerue (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA042361) Related document:5 MOTION for Steven J. German to appear pro hac vice. (LMD)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2017
5 5 motion Appear pro hac vice Mon 1:57 PM
MOTION for W. Mark Lanier, Richard D. Meadow, Christopher L. Gadoury, Ryan D. Ellis, Thomas V. Girardi, Christopher T. Nidel, Jonathan Nace, Joel M. Rubenstein, and Steven J. German to appear pro hac vice by John J. Jerue. (O'Toole, Neal)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2017
4 4 order Related case order and track 2 notice Fri 3:12 PM
NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 3/10/2017. (SMB)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Standing Order re: 25 pages Fri 11:26 AM
STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages (See 8:08-mc-00094-T17). Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 7/15/2008. (AMD)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons issued Fri 11:22 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Drummond Company, Inc. (AMD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11:22 AM
COMPLAINT against Drummond Company, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number TPA-042269) filed by John J. Jerue.(AMD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet