Bogomol v. USA
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Terry R Means |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00216 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 29, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 03, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
USCA Letter
Tue 05/03 10:25 AM
Supreme Court Order No.21- 1318 . Enclosed is a copy of the Supreme Court order denying certiorari. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied.[ 18-11486 (tle) |
|
Att: 1 Supreme Court Order | ||
Thursday, January 06, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
USCA Opinion
Thu 01/06 12:13 PM
Opinion of USCA No. 18-11486 in accordance with USCA judgment re8 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gregory Bogomol. Accordingly, we AFFIRM. (tle) |
|
16 | 16
appeal
USCA Judgment/Mandate
Thu 01/06 11:53 AM
JUDGMENT/MANDATE of USCA No. 18-11486 as to8 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gregory Bogomol. IT IS ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED. Issued as Mandate: 1/6/2022. (tle) |
|
Att: 1 USCA5 Cover Letter | ||
Tuesday, January 04, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
USCA Order
Tue 01/04 10:47 AM
ORDER of USCA No. 18-11486 as to8 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gregory Bogomol. The petition for panel rehearing is DENIED. Because no member of the panel or judge in regular active service requested that the court be polled on rehearing en banc (FED. R. APP. P. 35 and 5th CIR. R. 35), the petition for rehearing en banc is DENIED. (tle) |
|
Att: 1 USCA5 Cover Letter | ||
Thursday, December 02, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 12/02 3:01 PM
ORDER of USCA No. 18-11486 as to8 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gregory Bogomol. IT IS ORDERED that appellants motion for an extension of 10 days, to and including December 13, 2021, to file a petition for rehearing/petition for rehearing en banc is GRANTED. (tle) |
|
Att: 1 USCA5 Cover Letter | ||
Tuesday, October 26, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
appeal
USCA Letter
Tue 10/26 2:47 PM
Received letter from United States Court of Appeals Fifth Circuit No. 18-11486 The court has granted an extension of time to and including December 2, 2021 for filing a petition for rehearing in this case. You are reminded that we must actually receive any petition for rehearing in this office by the due date. (tle). Modified on 10/26/2021 (tle) |
|
12 | 12
appeal
USCA Order
Tue 10/26 2:46 PM
ORDER of USCA No. 18-11486 as to8 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gregory Bogomol. IT IS ORDERED that Appellants motion for an extension of 35 days, to and including 12/2/2021, to file a petition for rehearing/rehearing En Banc is GRANTED. (tle) |
|
Friday, September 17, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
appeal
USCA Order
Fri 09/17 9:39 AM
ORDER of USCA 18-11486 as to8 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gregory Bogomol. IT IS ORDERED that Appellants motion for an extension of 30 days, or, to and including 10/27/2021, to file a petition for rehearing/petition for rehearing en banc is GRANTED... IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of Andrew Greenlee to withdraw as court- appointed counsel is GRANTED. (tle) |
|
Att: 1 USCA5 Cover Letter | ||
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 12/18 11:23 AM
APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Amanda R. Burch for party(s) Appellee USA, in case 18-11486 Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle) |
||
Wednesday, October 23, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
USCA Letter
Wed 10/23 11:09 AM
Received letter from United States Court of Appeals Fifth Circuit re ;No. 18-11486 Enclosed is an order entered in this case. A briefing schedule is being issued under separate cover. (tle) |
|
9 | 9
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 10/23 11:08 AM
ORDER of USCA No. 18-11486 as to8 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gregory Bogomol. Accordingly, Bogomols motion for a COA is GRANTED on this issue.The clerk is DIRECTED to establish a briefing schedule, notify the Government that a COA has been granted, and include the Government in the briefing schedule. (tle) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2019 | ||
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 08/14 12:33 PM
APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney Leigha Amy Simonton for Appellee USA. Access to the EROA has been granted. 18-11486 (tle) |
||
Monday, December 17, 2018 | ||
appeal
Appeal Record Certified/Transmitted
Mon 12/17 10:25 AM
Record on Appeal for USCA5 18-11486 : Record consisting of: 1 ECF Civil electronic record on appeal, 1 ECF Criminal electronic record on appeal (eROA) is certified, 3 Volume(s) electronic transcript, Sealed or ex parte electronic document number(s): 2,27,36-38 (circuit approval is required for access), 1 Electronic Presentence Report/SOR certified to USCA. PLEASE NOTE THE FOLLOWING: Licensed attorneys must have filed an appearance in the USCA5 case and be registered for electronic filing in the USCA5 to access the paginated eROA in the USCA5 ECF system. (Take these steps immediately if you have not already done so. Once you have filed the notice of appearance and/or USCA5 ECF registration, it may take up to 3 business days for the circuit to notify the district clerk that we may grant you access to the eROA in the USCA5 ECF system.) To access the paginated record, log in to the USCA5 ECF system, and under the Utilities menu, select Electronic Record on Appeal. Pro se litigants may request a copy of the record by[LINK:contacting the appeals deputy] in advance to arrange delivery. (tle) |
||
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 11/27 10:46 AM
USCA Case Number 18-11486 in United States Court of Appeals Fifth Circuit for8 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gregory Bogomol. (tle) |
||
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 11/19 9:25 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to7 Judgment, to the Fifth Circuit by Gregory Bogomol. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0539-9592890. T.O. form to appellant electronically at[LINK:Transcript Order Form] or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions[LINK:here] . (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Greenlee, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, November 07, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Judgment
Thu 11/08 8:40 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the order issued on October 29, 2018 (doc. 6) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58, Petitioners motion to vacate sentence under 28 U.S.C. §2255 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE to its refiling. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 11/7/2018) (mpw) |
|
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
20
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Mon 10/29 11:03 AM
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO VACATE SENTENCE AND CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY: The Court DENIES Petitioner's motion under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 WITH PREJUDICE and concludes that reasonable jurists could not question this Court's resolution of Petitioner's claims. As a result, a certificate of appealability will not issue. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 10/29/2018) (bdb) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
respm
Appendix in Support
Mon 05/15 9:57 AM
Appendix in Support filed by USA re4 Response/Objection to motion under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 (Funnell-DOJ, Timothy) |
|
4 | 4
respm
Response/Objection
Mon 05/15 9:56 AM
RESPONSE filed by USA re:1 MOTION to Vacate (Funnell-DOJ, Timothy) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel - AUSA - AFPD
Wed 05/03 10:34 AM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. (Funnell-DOJ, Timothy) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer
Thu 03/16 10:15 AM
Order to Show Cause, Notice, and Instructions to Parties. The clerk has served this order and will regenerate notice of the motion and supporting documents to the designated Assistant US Attorney. Wes Hendrix-DOJ for USA added. AUSA shall within 60 days from the date of this order, file an answer. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 3/16/2017) (wrb) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Vacate
Fri 03/10 10:50 AM
MOTION to Vacate filed by Gregory Bogomol (Greenlee, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Vacate and Set Aside Sentence under 28 U.S.C. § 2255, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
qcref
Means
Fri 03/10 11:28 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) File to: Judge Means. (hth) |