Hawthorne et al v. Union Square Federal Credit Union
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Reed C O'Connor |
Case #: | 7:17-cv-00025 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 10, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2017 4:27 AM CDT |
Defendant
Union Square Federal Credit Union
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Christoff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charlotte Foster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judy Hawthorne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marsha Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sue Moss
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
10
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Tue 04/10 8:16 AM
ORDER: In consideration of the fact that all five of the Bowen factors weigh in favor of denying Defendant's Motion for Attorneys' Fees (ECF No.30 ), the Court, in the exercise of its broad discretion, DENIES the motion. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/9/2018) (skg) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
respm
Reply
Thu 03/01 5:18 PM
REPLY filed by Union Square Federal Credit Union re:30 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Collins, Bryan) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order on Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion
Fri 02/23 11:38 AM
ORDER granting sealed and/or ex parte motion34 . (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/23/2018) (skg) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion
Thu 02/22 1:29 PM
(Document Restricted) Plaintiffs' Sealed Motion for Leave to File the Declarations of Sue Moss, Marsha Johnson, and John Christoff in Plaintiffs' Appendix [Doc. No. 33] Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by John Christoff, Charlotte Foster, Judy Hawthorne, Marsha Johnson, Sue Moss (Bracken, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration(s) Appendix, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
respm
Appendix in Support
Thu 02/15 11:58 PM
Appendix in Support filed by John Christoff, Charlotte Foster, Judy Hawthorne, Marsha Johnson, Sue Moss re32 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Bracken, Douglas) |
|
32 | 32
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Thu 02/15 11:32 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by John Christoff, Charlotte Foster, Judy Hawthorne, Marsha Johnson, Sue Moss re31 Appendix in Support,30 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Bracken, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Appendix in Support
Thu 01/25 5:45 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Union Square Federal Credit Union re30 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Collins, Bryan) |
|
30 | 30
motion
Attorney Fees
Thu 01/25 5:44 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Union Square Federal Credit Union with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Collins, Bryan) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
order
Judgment
Thu 01/11 8:39 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT: This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/10/2018) (skg) |
|
28 | 28
12
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 01/11 8:37 AM
ORDER: Because Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (ECF No.18 ) does not show that the Plan is subject to ERISA, and therefore does not state a claim for relief under ERISA, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint (ECF No.21 ) should be, and is hereby, GRANTED. Accordingly, this Court ORDERS Plaintiffs Amended Complaint DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/10/2018) (skg) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Vacate
Thu 12/07 5:22 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Amended Scheduling Order and Vacate Trial Setting filed by Union Square Federal Credit Union with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Collins, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Tue 10/31 3:45 PM
ORDER granting25 Motion for Leave to File. Discovery due by 2/8/2018. Deadline for mediation is on or before 1/8/2018. Motions due by 3/8/2018. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/31/2017) (skg) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Leave to File
Thu 10/26 4:00 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File to Modify Court's Scheduling Order filed by Union Square Federal Credit Union with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Collins, Bryan) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Reply
Thu 08/31 4:59 PM
REPLY filed by Union Square Federal Credit Union re:21 First MOTION to Dismiss (Collins, Bryan) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Response/Objection
Thu 08/17 6:59 PM
RESPONSE filed by John Christoff, Charlotte Foster, Judy Hawthorne, Marsha Johnson, Sue Moss re:21 First MOTION to Dismiss (Bracken, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 08/01 4:53 PM
ANSWER to18 Amended Complaint,, filed by Union Square Federal Credit Union. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Dunn, R) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Dismiss
Thu 07/27 5:50 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Union Square Federal Credit Union with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Dunn, R) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Reply
Fri 07/21 4:31 PM
REPLY filed by Union Square Federal Credit Union re:16 First MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Original Third-Party Complaint Against Don Massie (Dunn, R) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Response/Objection
Mon 07/17 6:39 PM
RESPONSE filed by John Christoff, Charlotte Foster, Judy Hawthorne, Marsha Johnson, Sue Moss re:16 First MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Original Third-Party Complaint Against Don Massie (Bracken, Douglas) |
|
18 | 18
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 07/17 6:22 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs filed by Judy Hawthorne, John Christoff, Charlotte Foster, Marsha Johnson, Sue Moss. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bracken, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Thu 07/06 3:29 PM
ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint (ECF No.16 ), filed July 5, 2017. The Certificate of Conference indicates that Plaintiffs currently oppose the motion. Def.'s Mot. 4, ECF No.16 . Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs file a Response to Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint (ECF No. 16), explaining their opposition on or before July 17, 2017, and Defendants file a Reply on or before July 21, 2017. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/6/2017) (plp) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Leave to File
Wed 07/05 4:14 PM
First MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Original Third-Party Complaint Against Don Massie filed by Union Square Federal Credit Union with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Dunn, R) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Defendant's Original Third-Party Complaint | ||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 06/20 3:02 PM
ORDER: Based on the foregoing, the Court finds that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No.6 ) should be and is hereby GRANTED in part. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' claims are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiffs are granted the right to re-plead to cure any defects on or before July 17, 2017. If Plaintiffs fail to respond by this deadline, or their amended complaint is dismissed, Plaintiffs' ERISA claims will be dismissed with prejudice and Plaintiffs' state law claim will be dismissed without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/20/2017) (baa) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Reply
Tue 05/16 4:43 PM
REPLY filed by Union Square Federal Credit Union re:6 First MOTION to Dismiss (Collins, Bryan) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 05/05 11:20 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 7/5/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 7/5/2017. Motions due by 1/8/2018. Deadline for mediation is on or before 11/8/2017. Discovery due by 12/8/2017. Pretrial Order due by 4/12/2018. Bench Trial set for 5/7/2018 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 222, 1000 Lamar Street, Wichita Falls, TX 76301-3431 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/5/2017) (skg) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Status Report
Thu 05/04 5:22 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by John Christoff, Charlotte Foster, Judy Hawthorne, Marsha Johnson, Sue Moss. (Bracken, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response/Objection
Tue 05/02 5:47 PM
RESPONSE filed by John Christoff, Charlotte Foster, Judy Hawthorne, Marsha Johnson, Sue Moss re:6 First MOTION to Dismiss (Bracken, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation
Wed 04/26 2:47 PM
Agreed STIPULATION to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by John Christoff, Charlotte Foster, Judy Hawthorne, Marsha Johnson, Sue Moss. (Bracken, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order for Scheduling Order Proposal
Thu 04/06 11:56 AM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Report due by 5/4/2017. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/6/2017) (baa) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/05 4:31 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Union Square Federal Credit Union. (Dunn, R) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/05 4:29 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, filed by Union Square Federal Credit Union. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Dunn, R) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss
Wed 04/05 4:27 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Union Square Federal Credit Union with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney R Rogge Dunn added to party Union Square Federal Credit Union(pty:dft) (Dunn, R) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/10 2:58 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by John Christoff, Charlotte Foster, Judy Hawthorne, Marsha Johnson, Sue Moss. (Bracken, Douglas) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/10 2:33 PM
Summons Issued as to Union Square Federal Credit Union. (plp) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Request for Clerk to Issue Document
Fri 03/10 1:52 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by John Christoff, Charlotte Foster, Judy Hawthorne, Marsha Johnson, Sue Moss. (Bracken, Douglas) |
|
2 | 2
qcref
O' Connor (WICHITA FALLS CASES)
Fri 03/10 10:29 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ray). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (baa) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/10 9:28 AM
COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs filed by Judy Hawthorne, John Christoff, Charlotte Foster, Marsha Johnson, Sue Moss. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8267147) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bracken, Douglas) |