ION Trading Ireland Limited v. Wedbush Securities Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Vernon S Broderick |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01793 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332oc Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2017 5:05 AM EDT |
Defendant
Wedbush Securities Inc.
1000 Wilshire Boulevard
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ION Trading Ireland Limited
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 01/10 6:05 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Wedbush Securities Inc. and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by ION Trading Ireland Limited.(Walsh, Patrick) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Protective Order
Wed 12/20 2:23 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIALITY OF DISCOVERY MATERIAL AND INADVERTENT DISCLOSURE OF PRIVILEGED MATERIAL...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/20/2017) (rj) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
3
pgs
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 06/26 2:58 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). The parties have engaged in settlement discussions. This case is not to be tried to a jury. The parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 3 days. Deposition due by 10/6/2017. Expert Deposition due by 12/22/2017. Fact Discovery due by 10/20/2017. Expert Discovery due by 12/22/2017. Discovery due by 1/26/2018. Status Conference set for 2/15/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/23/2017) (rj) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Thu 07/06 12:21 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vernon S. Broderick: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/23/2017. (msa) |
||
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
8
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 05/10 4:57 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Wedbush Securities Inc..(Morrissy, John) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/19 4:23 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stuart Alan Krause on behalf of Wedbush Securities Inc.. (Krause, Stuart) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 04/07 6:55 PM
ORDER: granting7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Wedbush Securities Inc. answer due 5/10/2017. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/7/2017) (ap) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/06 5:05 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Wedbush, Inc. for Wedbush Securities Inc.. Document filed by Wedbush Securities Inc..(Morrissy, John) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 04/06 5:02 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to complaint to and including May 10, 2017 addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from J. David Morrissy dated April 6, 2017. Document filed by Wedbush Securities Inc..(Morrissy, John) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/13 11:29 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wedbush Securities Inc.. (pc) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Mon 03/13 11:21 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Patrick Joseph Walsh. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pc) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 03/13 11:23 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 03/13 11:23 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 03/13 11:23 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 03/10 5:39 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Patrick Joseph Walsh on behalf of ION Trading Ireland Limited. New Address: Law Office of Patrick J. Walsh, 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 28th Floor, New York, New York, United States 10019, (917) 322-0513. (Walsh, Patrick) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/10 12:48 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ION Trading Technologies Sarl for ION Trading Ireland Limited. Document filed by ION Trading Ireland Limited.(Walsh, Patrick) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 03/10 12:43 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wedbush Securities Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by ION Trading Ireland Limited. (Walsh, Patrick) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 03/10 12:29 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Walsh, Patrick) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/10 12:17 PM
COMPLAINT against Wedbush Securities Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13408533)Document filed by ION Trading Ireland Limited.(Walsh, Patrick) |