Manser v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane Triche Milazzo |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02072 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 17, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 08, 2017 4:16 AM CDT |
Defendant
Aventis Pharma S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Defendant
Winthrop U.S.
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharma Global, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Accord Healthcare, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Hospira Worldwide, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Hospira, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharma Global FZE
|
|
Plaintiff
Rhonda Manser
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 17, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
8
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 05/17 2:29 PM
MINUTE ENTRY. IT IS ORDERED that the following cases are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for the reasons stated on the record: Davis Tina, 2:17-cv-12052 andHatchett Glenda, 2:17-cv-16580. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the cases listed in the attached Exhibit A are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for the reasons stated on the record. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that ruling on the cases listed in the attached Exhibit B is DEFERRED for reasons stated on the record. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the cases listed in the attached Exhibit C are granted additional time, as stated herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a show cause hearing is SET for May 2, 2022, at 3:00 p.m. to hear the cases in the attached Exhibit D. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 04/28/2022. **See Rec. Doc 14137 filed in master case 16-md-2740**(am) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 05/21 4:01 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
service
Summons Issued
Thu 10/05 2:45 PM
Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. f/k/a Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories Ltd.. (cc) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
service
Request for Summons Issued
Wed 10/04 3:05 PM
Request of Summons Issued as to Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. f/k/a Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories Ltd. filed by Rhonda Manser re2 Complaint.(Wall, Carasusana) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
13 | 13
service
Request for Summons Issued
Wed 10/04 3:02 PM
Request of Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc. filed by Rhonda Manser re2 Complaint. (Wall, Carasusana) |
|
12 | 12
service
Request for Summons Issued
Wed 10/04 3:01 PM
Request of Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc. filed by Rhonda Manser re2 Complaint.(Wall, Carasusana) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Tue 09/12 3:33 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re9 Summons Submitted for Issuance,10 Summons Submitted for Issuance. Filing attorney submitted summons for parties that are not named in the Complaint. Please refer to PTO #56 for instructions on the issuance of summons with corrected defendant's name. Summons has not been issued. (tm) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Submitted for Issuance
Mon 09/11 11:13 AM
Summons Submitted for Issuance (Wall, Carasusana) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Submitted for Issuance
Mon 09/11 11:11 AM
Summons Submitted for Issuance (Wall, Carasusana) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/31 10:00 AM
Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd., Hospira Worldwide, Inc., Hospira, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharma Global, Inc., Winthrop U.S.. (cc) |
|
Sunday, July 30, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Submitted for Issuance
Sun 07/30 8:05 PM
Summons Submitted for Issuance(Wall, Carasusana) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons | ||
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Taxotere Amended Complaint
Wed 05/31 10:37 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT by Rhonda Manser. Party Sandoz, Inc., Accord Healthcare, Inc., Hospira Worldwide Inc., Hospira Inc., Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharma Global Inc., Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd., Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc., Actavis Pharma Inc. and Winthrop U.S. added. (Kranz, Michelle) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Tue 03/14 4:35 PM
PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/14 10:22 AM
Summons Issued as to Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.(tm) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 03/13 3:21 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/13 12:59 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Fee previously paid) filed by Rhonda Manser.(Wall, Carasusana) |
|
Sunday, March 12, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 03/12 10:00 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6018987) filed by Rhonda Manser.Attorney Carasusana Bibiana Wall added to party Rhonda Manser(pty:pla).(Wall, Carasusana) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons |