Chandler v. Credit One Bank, N.A.
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Phillips |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00175 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 30, 2017 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 07, 2017 4:11 AM CDT |
Defendant
Credit One Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debra Lynn Chandler
10905 E. 72nd Terr.
Raytown, MO 64133 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Clerk's Order of Dismissal
Thu 11/30 1:14 PM
Clerk's ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (McIlvain, Kelly) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 11/30 8:26 AM
STIPULATION of dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by Debra Lynn Chandler. (Herring Springer, Chelsea) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Wed 11/29 12:25 PM
ORDER: The parties advised the Court on 10/6/2017 that they reached a settlement in this case. (Doc. 15.) The parties are directed to file a Stipulation of Dismissal or a Status Report on or by 12/11/2017. Signed on 11/29/17 by District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wolfe, Steve) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Settlement
Fri 10/06 9:09 AM
NOTICE of settlement by Debra Lynn Chandler (Herring Springer, Chelsea) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing Cancellation
Wed 07/05 3:29 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION - The Settlement Conference scheduled for Thursday, July 20, 2017 at 9:30am with Judge Sarah W. Hays has been cancelled. Per the Order entered on 6/21/2017 by Judge Phillips, this action is STAYED pending resolution of the dispute in arbitration. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Chorny, Traci) |
||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Stay
Wed 06/21 10:42 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO STAY13 : This action is STAYED pending resolution of the dispute in arbitration. Status Report due October 15, 2017 and every 3 months thereafter. Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration9 is moot. Signed on 6/21/17 by District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 06/21 10:53 AM
Status Report due by 10/15/2017. (Cordell, Annette) |
||
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Stay
Thu 06/15 2:00 PM
Joint MOTION to stay and Stipulation to Proceed in Arbitration filed by Robert K. Warren on behalf of Credit One Bank, N.A.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/29/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Warren, Robert) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 06/08 1:47 PM
ORDER granting11 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Shilee Therkelsen Mullin; Joshua C Dickinson and Kersten Holzhueter terminated. Signed on 6/8/17 by District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wolfe, Steve) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 06/08 1:30 PM
MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Joshua C Dickinson on behalf of Credit One Bank, N.A.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/22/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Dickinson, Joshua) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Compel
Fri 06/02 2:02 PM
MOTION to compel - Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Proposed Order filed by Robert K. Warren on behalf of Credit One Bank, N.A.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/16/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Warren, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
motion
Compel
Fri 06/02 1:58 PM
MOTION to compel Arbitration filed by Robert K. Warren on behalf of Credit One Bank, N.A.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/16/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Warren, Robert) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/02 1:52 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Robert K. Warren on behalf of Credit One Bank, N.A. (Attorney Robert K. Warren added to party Credit One Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Warren, Robert) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order
Thu 05/04 2:49 PM
ORAL ORDER MAP Mediation Conference set for 7/20/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6E, Kansas City (SWH) before Magistrate Judge Sarah W. Hays. Parties are directed to review the MAP General Order found on the Local Rules, ESI Principles, Procedures & Fees section of the Courts website, paying particular attention to section five, subsection E (Attendance at Program Session and Location). Parties are directed to contact chambers forthwith if they believe the mediation conference will exceed half-a-day. Signed on May 4, 2017 by Magistrate Judge Sarah W. Hays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Rule 16 Notice
Tue 05/02 11:40 AM
ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/16/2017. Rule 26 conference due by 6/2/2017. Signed on 5/2/17 by District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
discov
Disclosure of corporate interests
Mon 05/01 2:04 PM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Joshua C Dickinson on behalf of Defendant Credit One Bank, N.A..(Dickinson, Joshua) |
|
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/01 2:03 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, on behalf of Credit One Bank, N.A..(Attorney Joshua C Dickinson added to party Credit One Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Dickinson, Joshua) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Return of Service of Complaint Executed
Fri 03/24 8:49 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Debra Lynn Chandler. Credit One Bank, N.A. served on 3/20/2017, answer due 4/10/2017.(Herring Springer, Chelsea) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Notice of MAP | ||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of MAPJ
Mon 03/13 9:48 AM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Sarah W. Hays.(Ellis, Lindsey) |
|
Att: 1 MAP General Order | ||
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/13 9:52 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Credit One Bank, N.A.. (Ellis, Lindsey) |
||
Saturday, March 11, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sat 03/11 11:28 AM
COMPLAINT against Credit One Bank, N.A. filed by Chelsea S. Herring Springer on behalf of Debra Lynn Chandler. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0866-5209299. Service due by 6/9/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Herring Springer, Chelsea) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A - E, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |