Center Designs, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 9:17-bk-02044
Lead case is: 9:17-bk-02044
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Caryl E Delano |
Case #: | 9:17-bk-02045 |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 10, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $0 to $50,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Center Designs, LLC
27299 Riverview Center Blvd Ste 103 Bldg Ii
Bonita Springs, FL 34134-4322 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - FTM
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E. Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602 |
Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago |
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 10/10 5:03 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Laura G.) |
||
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
2
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Mon 11/27 2:29 PM
Order Dismissing Cases with Prejudice Barring the Debtors from Refiling for Six Months [Lead Case 17-bk-2044-FMD and Non-Lead Cases 17-bk-2045-FMD, 17-bk-2859-FMD and 17-bk-4172-FMD] . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Tina) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice Of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 05/30 4:26 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Notice of Appearance, Designation of Email Addresses and Request for Bankruptcy Notice Filed by Nicolette Corso Vilmos on behalf of Creditor Busy Beaver Building Centers, Inc.. (Vilmos, Nicolette) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Matrix | ||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Proof of Service
Thu 04/13 8:39 PM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration. Filed by Michael R Dal Lago on behalf of Debtor Center Designs, LLC . (Dal Lago, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
order
Joint Administration
Tue 04/11 9:22 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration - Lead Case 9:17-bk-02044-FMD with 9:17-bk-02045-FMD and 9:17-bk-02859-FMD . Service Instructions: Michael Dal Lago is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Kimberly P.) |
|
court
(NO PAPER) - Notice Of Consolidation/Joint Administration of Cases
Tue 04/11 3:35 PM
Notice of Joint Administration of Cases. No further papers to be docketed in this case. All papers should be docketed in Case No. 9:17-bk-02044-FMD . (Kimberly P.) |
||
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice Of Compliance
Mon 04/10 2:07 PM
Notice of Compliance Filed by Luis E Rivera II on behalf of Creditor Carter Bank & Trust . (Rivera, Luis) |
|
court
ADI Reminder to Prepare and Serve Notice of Hearing
Mon 04/10 11:45 PM
Michael R Dal Lago is reminded to prepare, file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties. Re: Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 04/19/2017 10:30 AM Ft. Myers, FL - Room 4-117, Courtroom E, United States Courthouse, 2110 First Street, Ft. Myers, FL. Re: Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 9:17-bk-02044-FMD with 9:17-bk-02045-FMD and 9:17-bk-02859-FMD Doc29 . Failure to do so will result in the cancellation of the hearing that addresses this specific matter. (ADIclerk) |
||
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
misc
Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY)
Fri 04/07 9:04 AM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Michael R Dal Lago on behalf of Debtor Center Designs, LLC . (Dal Lago, Michael) |
||
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information
Thu 04/06 8:39 AM
Order Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information (Extended to April 11, 2017) Service Instructions: Michael Dal Lago is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Alyssa) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Proof of Service
Thu 04/06 6:24 AM
Proof of Service of Agreed Interim Order Granting Motion to Prohibit Use of Cash Collateral. Filed by Luis E Rivera II on behalf of Creditor Carter Bank & Trust . (Rivera, Luis) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
court
Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only
Wed 04/05 9:39 AM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 04/19/2017 10:30 AM Ft. Myers, FL - Room 4-117, Courtroom E, United States Courthouse, 2110 First Street, Ft. Myers, FL. Re: Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 9:17-bk-02044-FMD with 9:17-bk-02045-FMD and 9:17-bk-02859-FMD Doc29 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions: Michael R Dal Lago is directed to prepare, file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. Failure to comply with the noticing instructions will result in cancellation of the hearing that addresses this specific matter. . (Dkt) |
||
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Motion for Joint Administration
Tue 04/04 5:23 PM
Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 9:17-bk-02044-FMD with 9:17-bk-02045-FMD and 9:17-bk-02859-FMD Filed by Michael R Dal Lago on behalf of Debtor Center Designs, LLC (Dal Lago, Michael) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice Of Withdrawal of Pleadings
Tue 04/04 5:21 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' Motion for Joint Administration of Affiliated Cases Filed by Michael R Dal Lago on behalf of Debtor Center Designs, LLC . (Dal Lago, Michael) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information
Mon 04/03 4:58 PM
Second Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Michael R Dal Lago on behalf of Debtor Center Designs, LLC (Dal Lago, Michael) |
|
26 | 26
order
Order (Generic)
Mon 04/03 8:48 AM
Agreed Interim Order Granting Motion to Prohibit Use of Cash Collateral . Hearing scheduled for 4/19/2017 at 10:30 AM at Ft. Myers, FL - Room 4-117, Courtroom E, United States Courthouse, 2110 First Street, Ft. Myers, FL. Service Instructions: Luis Rivera is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Deborah K.) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Proof of Service
Wed 03/29 4:08 PM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Schedules or Required Information. Filed by Michael R Dal Lago on behalf of Debtor Center Designs, LLC . (Dal Lago, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Motion for Joint Administration
Tue 03/28 2:46 PM
Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 9:17-bk-02044-FMD with 9:17-bk-02045-FMD Filed by Michael R Dal Lago on behalf of Debtor Center Designs, LLC (Dal Lago, Michael) |
|
23 | 23
order
Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information
Tue 03/28 2:28 PM
Order Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information until April 3, 2017 Service Instructions: Michael Dal Lago is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Deanna) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Statement/Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney
Mon 03/27 3:45 PM
Statement/Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Filed by Michael R Dal Lago on behalf of Debtor Center Designs, LLC. (Dal Lago, Michael) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information
Mon 03/27 3:35 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Michael R Dal Lago on behalf of Debtor Center Designs, LLC (Dal Lago, Michael) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice Of Hearing
Fri 03/24 9:38 AM
Notice of Hearing on Motion to Prohibit Use of Cash Collateral and Memorandum in Support Filed by Luis E Rivera II on behalf of Creditor Carter Bank & Trust . Hearing scheduled for 4/19/2017 at 10:30 AM at Ft. Myers, FL - Room 4-117, Courtroom E, United States Courthouse, 2110 First Street, Ft. Myers, FL. (Rivera, Luis) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice
Fri 03/24 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing . Notice Date 03/23/2017. (Admin.) |
|
court
Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only
Thu 03/23 8:42 AM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 04/19/2017 10:30 AM Ft. Myers, FL - Room 4-117, Courtroom E, United States Courthouse, 2110 First Street, Ft. Myers, FL. Re: Motion to Prohibit Use of Cash Collateral and Memorandum in Support Doc18 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions: Luis E Rivera is directed to prepare, file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. Failure to comply with the noticing instructions will result in cancellation of the hearing that addresses this specific matter. . (Dkt) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Motion to Prohibit Use of Cash Collateral
Tue 03/21 3:58 PM
Motion to Prohibit Use of Cash Collateral and Memorandum in Support Filed by Luis E Rivera II on behalf of Creditor Carter Bank & Trust (Rivera, Luis) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Note dated 9/24/14 for $30MM | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Note dated 1/21/2016 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Note dated 9/24/2014 for $15MM | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Note dated 9/24/14 for $8MM | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5a - Credit Line DOT - Randolph County | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5b - Credit Line DOT - Randolph County | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 5c - Credit Line DOT - Randolph County | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 6a - Credit Line DOT - Greenbrier County | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 6b - Credit Line DOT - Greenbrier County | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 7a - Credit Line DOT - Marion County | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 7b - Credit Line DOT - Marion County | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 8 - Security Agreement | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 9 - UCC | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 10 - Letter to Michael Del Lago dated 3/13/17 | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 11 - Follow up Letter to Michael Del Lago dated 3/16/17 | ||
17 | 17
court
Notice Of Hearing / Status Conference
Tue 03/21 10:09 AM
Notice of Status Conference . Hearing scheduled for 4/19/2017 at 10:30 AM at Ft. Myers, FL - Room 4-117, Courtroom E, United States Courthouse, 2110 First Street, Ft. Myers, FL. (Bernadette) |
|
Sunday, March 19, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order
Mon 03/20 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order . Notice Date 03/19/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, March 18, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sun 03/19 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. . Notice Date 03/18/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 03/18 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 03/17/2017. (Admin.) |
|
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest
Sat 03/18 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest . Notice Date 03/17/2017. (Admin.) |
|
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sat 03/18 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. . Notice Date 03/17/2017. (Admin.) |
|
11 | 11
order
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 03/17 2:05 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice of Jonathan L. Hauser for Carter Bank & Trust. Upon completion of the required registration form, a temporary login and password will be issued. Filing privileges are limited to this case and any related adversary proceedings. The attorney is directed to file a statement notifying the Clerk when Attorneys involvement in this case is concluded . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Alyssa) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
court
Notice Of Continued/Rescheduled Section 341(a) Meeting
Thu 03/16 2:52 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Section 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/20/2017 at 01:00 PM at Ft. Myers, FL (892) - 2-101 United States Courthouse, 2110 First Street. (Nita) |
|
9 | 9
court
341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline
Thu 03/16 2:31 PM
Notice of Commencement of Case, Section 341 Meeting of Creditors, and Fixing Deadlines . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/19/2017 at 03:30 PM at Ft. Myers, FL (892) - 2-101 United States Courthouse, 2110 First Street. Proofs of Claims due by 7/3/2017. (Nita) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Motion to Appear pro hac vice
Thu 03/16 12:44 PM
Amended Motion of Jonathan L. Hauser, of Troutman Sanders LLP to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Luis E Rivera II on behalf of Creditor Carter Bank & Trust . (Rivera, Luis) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Thu 03/16 9:18 AM
List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Michael R Dal Lago on behalf of Debtor Center Designs, LLC. (Dal Lago, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
court
Notice Of Deficient Filing
Wed 03/15 1:47 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Missing Summary of 'schedules, Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs, Corporate Ownership Statement, Attorney Statement of Compensation,, 20 Largest List and Chapter 11 Summary . (Bernadette) |
|
5 | 5
court
341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline
Wed 03/15 1:37 PM
Notice of Commencement of Case, Section 341 Meeting of Creditors, and Fixing Deadlines . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/19/2017 at 03:30 PM at Ft. Myers, FL (892) - 2-101 United States Courthouse, 2110 First Street. Proofs of Claims due by 7/3/2017. (Bernadette) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Motion to Appear pro hac vice
Wed 03/15 11:19 AM
Motion of Jonathan L. Hauser, of Troutman Sanders LLP to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Luis E Rivera II on behalf of Creditor Carter Bank & Trust (Rivera, Luis) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order Authorizing DIP to Operate Business
Tue 03/14 9:15 PM
Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice Of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 03/14 11:38 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Luis E Rivera II on behalf of Creditor Carter Bank & Trust. (Rivera, Luis) |
|
assign
Assign Judge and Trustee to Electronically Filed Cases
Tue 03/14 8:39 AM
Assignment of the Honorable Caryl E. Delano, Bankruptcy Judge to this case. The Trustee appointed to this case is United States Trustee . (Tampa) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
4
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 03/13 7:08 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Michael R Dal Lago on behalf of Center Designs, LLC. (Dal Lago, Michael) |
|
crditcrd
none
Mon 03/13 7:10 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(9:17-bk-02045) [misc,volp11a2] (1717.00). Receipt Number 52999604, Amount Paid $1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry)
Mon 03/13 9:03 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk) |