Ochoa v. Johns et al
Georgia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lisa G Wood |
Referred: | R Stan Baker |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00031 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal) |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 13, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment
Mon 11/13 5:22 PM
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to10 Order entered 11/9/17. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 11/13/2017. (ca) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Thu 11/09 9:11 AM
ORDER ADOPTING9 Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge as the opinion of the Court. The Court DISMISSES without prejudice Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241, and DENIES Petitioner leave to proceed in forma pauperis on a appeal. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to CLOSE this case and to enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 11/9/2017. (ca) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Report and Recommendations Order
Wed 09/20 10:10 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DISMISS without prejudice Ochoa's1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241, and DIRECT the Clerk to CLOSE this case. It is further RECOMMENDED that the Court DENY Ochoa leave to proceed in forma pauperis status on appeal. The Court ORDERS any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 10/4/2017). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/20/2017. (ca) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
respoth
Response
Mon 04/24 12:13 PM
RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Juan Ramon Ochoa filed by Tracy Johns.(Jones, Anica) Modified on 4/24/2017 (slt) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
U.S. Marshal Return of Service
Mon 04/10 4:20 PM
U.S. Marshal Return as to Tracy Johns c/o Attorney General of the U.S. for1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Juan Ramon Ochoa,3 Order, on 4/5/2017. (ca) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
U.S. Marshal Return of Service
Thu 04/06 11:26 AM
U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to U.S. Attorney for1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Juan Ramon Ochoa,3 Order on 4/3/17. Certificate of Service was signed by R. Oats on 4/3/17. (wwp) |
|
4 | 4
service
U.S. Marshal Return of Service
Thu 04/06 10:38 AM
U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to Tracy Johns for1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Juan Ramon Ochoa,3 Order on 4/3/17. (wwp) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 04/06 11:46 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 4/24/2017. (ca) |
||
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Wed 03/29 2:15 PM
ORDER directing the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and a copy of this Order by registered or certified mail upon: (1) the Attorney General of the U.S.; (2) the named Respondent; and (3) the civil process clerk at the office of the U.S. Attorney for the SDGA. Respondent is hereby ordered to show cause, in writing, why the Petitioner's writ should not be granted within twenty-one (21) days of the date of service. The Clerk is AUTHORIZED and DIRECTED to terminate all Respondents except Warden Tracy Johns upon the docket and record of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 3/29/2017. (ca) (ca) |
|
Att: 1 (3/29/2017) Prepared USM285-Attorney General of the U.S., | ||
Att: 2 (3/29/2017) Prepared USM285-Tracy Johns, | ||
Att: 3 (3/29/2017) Prepared USM285-U.S. Attorney for the SDGA | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 03/29 2:42 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 4/28/2017. (ca) |
||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
utility
Prisoner Fee
Thu 03/23 3:02 PM
Filing fee payment received, Amount $5.00, Receipt BWK007066. (ca) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Filing Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 03/13 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filing fee was omitted. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 4/3/2017. (ca) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 03/13 10:33 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. § 2241, filed by Juan Ramon Ochoa.(ca) |
|
Att: 1 Brief in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Letter Brief-Mr. Gregory Archanbeault, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope |