Tejeda et al v. John and Jane Does 1-10 et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Frederic Block |
Referred: | Steven Tiscione |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01406 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 05, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 6:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John and Jane Does 1-10
|
|
Plaintiff
Jose Tejeda
1584 DeKalb Avenue #1R
New York, NY 11237 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darlene Viera
1584 DeKalb Avenue #1R
New York, NY 11237 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 12/05 11:43 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by City of New York (Zangrilli, Joseph) |
|
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 12/05 12:00 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER DISMISSING CASE: See entry20 . Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 12/5/2017. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 12/01 3:22 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties will submit their stipulation of dismissal by December 5, 2017. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 12/1/2017.(Balocca, Louis) |
||
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 11/30 1:56 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File stipulation of dismissal by Jose Tejeda, Darlene Viera. (Sanderson, Carla) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
minutes
Settlement Conference
Mon 11/06 2:20 PM
Minute Entry for Settlement Conference held on 11/3/2017 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Sanderson for Plaintiffs; Zangrilli for Defendants. Settlement discussions were held and the parties were able to reach a disposition. Parties shall file the stipulation of dismissal by December 4, 2017. (FTR Log #11:32 - 11:33, 12:36 - 12:37.) (Vasquez, Lea) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Letter 1 - Exparte Document - to be used ONLY in conjunction with primary event selection
Tue 10/31 5:26 PM
Letter Confidential Ex Parte Settlement Statement by Jose Tejeda, Darlene Viera (Sanderson, Carla) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit plaintiffs settlement offer | ||
16 | 16
misc
Letter 1 - Exparte Document - to be used ONLY in conjunction with primary event selection
Tue 10/31 5:05 PM
Letter Confidential Ex Parte Settlement Statement by City of New York (Zangrilli, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 10/18 1:45 PM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for October 23, 2017 by City of New York. (Zangrilli, Joseph) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings Scheduling Order
Wed 10/18 2:20 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The settlement conference scheduled for October 23rd will instead be held at 11:00 a.m. on November 3, 2017. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 10/18/2017. (Vasquez, Lea) |
||
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 07/28 9:09 AM
Minute Entry for Initial Conference Hearing held on 7/27/2017 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Sanderson for Plaintiffs; Zangrilli for Defendants. The Court sets the following discovery deadlines: Deadline for completion of Rule 26(a) initial disclosures - 8/3/17; Completion of Phase I discovery - 10/9/17; Deadline for motions to join new parties or amend pleadings - 11/6/17; First requests for production of documents and interrogatories due by - 11/20/17; All fact discovery to be completed by 1/23/18; Exchange of expert reports - 2/22/18; Expert depositions completed by - 3/23/18; All discovery completed by - 4/11/18; Final date to take first step in dispositive motion practice - 4/20/18. An in-person settlement conference will be held on October 23, 2017 at 12:00 p.m. Parties are to submit their respective settlement positions via ex parte electronic filing no later than October 20, 2017. Counsel are to refer to the Settlement Section of this Court's Individual Rules in preparation for the conference. (Tape #10:17 - 10:19.) (Vasquez, Lea) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/24 11:51 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by City of New York. (Zangrilli, Joseph) |
|
Sunday, July 23, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Case Management Statement
Sun 07/23 1:46 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Discovery Plan Worksheet (Sanderson, Carla) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer Adjourn Conference
Wed 07/05 1:01 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by City of New York. (Zangrilli, Joseph) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings Scheduling Order
Wed 07/05 4:02 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer City of New York answer due 7/24/2017.; granting10 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The initial conference scheduled for July 11th will instead be held at 10:00 a.m. on July 27, 2017. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 7/5/2017. (Vasquez, Lea) |
||
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 04/28 3:21 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 4:00 p.m. on July 11, 2017 before the undersigned in Hearing Room N324 in the North Wing. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than July 7th. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 4/28/2017. (Vasquez, Lea) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 04/11 12:01 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer City of New York answer due 6/12/2017. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 4/11/2017. (Vasquez, Lea) |
||
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 04/10 2:47 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by City of New York. (Zangrilli, Joseph) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/10 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P. Zangrilli on behalf of City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Zangrilli, Joseph) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/24 3:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Tejeda, Darlene Viera. City of New York served on 3/23/2017, answer due 4/13/2017; John and Jane Does 1-10 served on 3/23/2017, answer due 4/13/2017. (Sanderson, Carla) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/16 10:58 AM
Summons Issued as to City of New York. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 03/16 10:56 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 03/16 10:56 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/16 10:56 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Steven L. Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/13 5:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carla M Sanderson on behalf of Jose Tejeda, Darlene Viera (notification declined or already on case) (Sanderson, Carla) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/13 5:02 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9362600 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Jose Tejeda, Darlene Viera. (Sanderson, Carla) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |