Hurst v. Blackwell et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert Pitman |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-00067 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Judgment
Tue 03/21 1:56 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Certificate of Appealability is DENIED. ORDERED that Petitioner John William Hursts Application for Habeas Corpus Relief is hereby DENIED. It is finally ORDERED that the above styled and numbered cause is hereby CLOSED. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jch) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order
Tue 03/21 1:54 PM
ORDERS that Petitioners petition for writ of habeas corpus is DENIED. The Court finally ORDERS that a certificate of appealability is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jch) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/14 12:28 PM
Text Order GRANTING2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ab2) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Letter/Correspondence
Mon 03/13 2:05 PM
Letter/Correspondence to John William Hurst advising of receipt of case, case number, and generic case information. (jch) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/13 2:04 PM
MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by John William Hurst. (jch) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 03/13 2:04 PM
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by John William Hurst.(jch) |