USA v. Jean Giles
Original Case: 2:14-cv-00978
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-01529 |
Type | civil / us |
Nature of Suit | 152 Contract - Recovery of Defaulted Student Loans (Excl. Veterans) |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 28, 2017 3:35 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
JEAN P. GILES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/28/2017 3:32 AM CDT |
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 U.S. civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 03/27/2017. [1] [6825221] 17-1529 (CD) |