KIPP Academy Charter School v. United Federation of Teachers, AFT NYSUT, AFL-CIO
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Deborah A Batts |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01863 |
Nature of Suit | 720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations |
Cause | 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts) |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 4:28 AM EDT |
Defendant
United Federation of Teachers, AFT NYSUT, AFL-CIO
52 Broadway, 9th Floor
New York, NY 10004 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KIPP Academy Charter School
730 Concourse Village West, Tower D
Bronx, NY 10451 |
Represented By
|
1. | KIPP Academy Charter School files federal lawsuit against the United Federation of Teachers (chalkbeat.org) |
Submitted Wed 03/22/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 02/20 4:43 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to33 Notice of Appeal, filed by KIPP Academy Charter School. USCA Case Number 17-1905 cv. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 02/20/2018. (nd) |
|
appeal
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge
Tue 02/20 5:07 PM
Transmission of USCA Mandate to the District Judge re:34 USCA Mandate,. (nd) |
||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
Att: 1 Notice of Right to Appeal, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Right to Kristy | ||
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order
Thu 05/18 6:16 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated May 18, 2017, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is granted and Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction to Stay Arbitration is denied; accordingly, this case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 05/19/2017)(dt) |
|
31 | 31
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Thu 05/18 4:38 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion to Dismiss; denying12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Accordingly, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction to Stay Arbitration is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the docket in this case. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 5/18/2017) (kgo) |
|
misc
Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk
Thu 05/18 4:39 PM
Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re:31 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (kgo) |
||
misc
Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk
Thu 05/18 6:17 PM
Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re:32 Order to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (jwh) |
||
misc
Notice Regarding Deleted Document
Fri 05/19 11:15 AM
***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 32 Order. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (jwh) |
||
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Wed 05/10 5:36 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . . Document filed by United Federation of Teachers, AFT NYSUT, AFL-CIO.(Vigliotti, Oriana) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Oriana Vigliotti, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh. A KIPP Docket | ||
29 | 29
respm
Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Wed 05/10 5:26 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by KIPP Academy Charter School. (Collins, Michael) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 04/28 4:50 PM
ORDER granting27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Granted. Kipp is also granted a one week extension for its reply. Replies due by 5/10/2017. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 4/28/2017) (kgo) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 04/28 10:11 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply corrective response to KIPP counsel's opposition addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Oriana Vigliotti dated 4/28/17. Document filed by United Federation of Teachers, AFT NYSUT, AFL-CIO.(Vigliotti, Oriana) |
|
Att: 1 Emails re request for extension, | ||
Att: 2 Hendry revisions | ||
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 04/27 6:50 PM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Michael P. Collins dated 04/27/2017 re:25 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Oriana Vigliotti dated 4/27/17. . Document filed by KIPP Academy Charter School. (Collins, Michael) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 04/27 4:21 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Oriana Vigliotti dated 4/27/17. Document filed by United Federation of Teachers, AFT NYSUT, AFL-CIO.(Vigliotti, Oriana) |
|
24 | 24
respm
Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Thu 04/27 9:57 AM
DECLARATION of Anne Goldman in Opposition re:12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by United Federation of Teachers, AFT NYSUT, AFL-CIO.(Vigliotti, Oriana) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Charter Proposal Part 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Charter Proposal Part 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Charter Proposal Part 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Charter Proposal Part 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Charter, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Welfare Fund Benefits, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit KIPP Welfare Payment | ||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order
Thu 04/27 8:41 AM
ORDER. The Court is in receipt of email correspondence of today informing the Court of Defendants' filing error. Defendants may refile Exhibit D of the Goldman Declaration with appropriate redactions on the ECF system. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 4/26/2017) (rjm) |
|
22 | 22
respm
Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Wed 04/26 6:51 PM
DECLARATION of Michael P. Collins in Opposition re:9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint .. Document filed by KIPP Academy Charter School.(Collins, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit UFT Unfair Labor Practice Charge Against KIPP Academy, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Complaint | ||
21 | 21
respm
Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Wed 04/26 6:48 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . . Document filed by KIPP Academy Charter School. (Collins, Michael) |
|
20 | 20
respm
Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Wed 04/26 3:48 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by United Federation of Teachers, AFT NYSUT, AFL-CIO. (Vigliotti, Oriana) |
|
19 | 19
respm
Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Wed 04/26 3:47 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE 24 Declaration) - DECLARATION of Anne Goldman in Opposition re:12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by United Federation of Teachers, AFT NYSUT, AFL-CIO.(Vigliotti, Oriana) Modified on 4/27/2017 (db). Docket Entry and Attachment 7 modified as per23 ORDER. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposal Part 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposal Part 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Proposal Part 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Proposal Part 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Charter, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Welfare Fund Doc, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit KIPP Welfare Payment | ||
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 04/14 1:38 PM
ORDER granting17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Granted. The parties are also requested to send in courtesy copies of all pleadings in this matter (past and future), per the Court's individual rules. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 4/14/2017) (kgo) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 04/13 2:23 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Oriana Vigliotti dated 4/13/2017. Document filed by United Federation of Teachers, AFT NYSUT, AFL-CIO.(Vigliotti, Oriana) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Wed 04/05 4:51 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by KIPP Academy Charter School. (Collins, Michael) |
|
15 | 15
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 04/05 4:48 PM
DECLARATION of Michael P. Collins in Support re:12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by KIPP Academy Charter School.(Collins, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 PERB Decision, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Unfair Labor Practice Charge | ||
14 | 14
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 04/05 4:46 PM
DECLARATION of Francis Corcoran in Support re:12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by KIPP Academy Charter School.(Collins, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Sample Appointment Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Handbook, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 Commitment to Excellence, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Petition | ||
13 | 13
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 04/05 4:43 PM
DECLARATION of Alicia Johnson in Support re:12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by KIPP Academy Charter School.(Collins, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Collective Bargaining Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 2- Handbook, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - June Letter, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. 4- Kipp Reply to June Letter, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. 5- Demand for Arbitration | ||
12 | 12
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Wed 04/05 4:39 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by KIPP Academy Charter School. Return Date set for 4/27/2017 at 09:30 AM.(Collins, Michael) |
|
11 | 11
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 04/05 1:00 PM
DECLARATION of Oriana Vigliotti in Support re:9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint .. Document filed by United Federation of Teachers, AFT NYSUT, AFL-CIO.(Vigliotti, Oriana) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh. A [Transcript], | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh. B [Verified Petition], | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh. C [Order to Show Cause], | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh. D [Notice of Appeal], | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exh. E [Dismissal Order], | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exh. F [AAA notice] | ||
10 | 10
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Wed 04/05 12:57 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . . Document filed by United Federation of Teachers, AFT NYSUT, AFL-CIO. (Vigliotti, Oriana) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Wed 04/05 12:51 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . Document filed by United Federation of Teachers, AFT NYSUT, AFL-CIO. Responses due by 4/19/2017(Vigliotti, Oriana) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/03 1:03 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Anne Hogan on behalf of United Federation of Teachers, AFT NYSUT, AFL-CIO. (Hogan, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Tue 03/21 9:38 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. United Federation of Teachers, AFT NYSUT, AFL-CIO served on 3/16/2017, answer due 4/6/2017. Service was accepted by Renee Harris, Administrative Assistant. Document filed by KIPP Academy Charter School. (Collins, Michael) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Mon 03/20 3:50 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Oriana Vigliotti on behalf of United Federation of Teachers, AFT NYSUT, AFL-CIO. New Address: Law Office of Richard E. Casagrande, 52 Broadway, 9th Floor, New York, NY, United States 10004, (212) 533-6300. (Vigliotti, Oriana) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/20 3:23 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Oriana Vigliotti on behalf of United Federation of Teachers, AFT NYSUT, AFL-CIO. (Vigliotti, Oriana) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/15 10:01 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United Federation of Teachers, AFT NYSUT, AFL-CIO. (laq) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 03/15 9:56 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Deborah A. Batts. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (laq) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 03/15 9:56 AM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. (laq) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 03/15 9:56 AM
Case Designated ECF. (laq) |
||
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 03/14 12:52 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United Federation of Teachers, AFT NYSUT, AFL-CIO, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by KIPP Academy Charter School. (Collins, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 03/14 12:19 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Collins, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/14 12:14 PM
COMPLAINT against United Federation of Teachers, AFT NYSUT, AFL-CIO. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13419205)Document filed by KIPP Academy Charter School.(Collins, Michael) |