Powell v. Wilson et al
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Joe Billy Mcdade |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01114 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 19, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Judgment
Mon 11/19 11:27 AM
JUDGMENT entered. (JRK, ilcd) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order Dismissing Case 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 11/19 10:27 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 11/19/2018. On 10/9/2018, the Court gave Plaintiff 21 days in which to file a Notice of Address change with the Clerk, as he had been released from custody and had failed to do so. On 10/1/18, Plaintiff was given an additional 14 days in which to provide his updated information. Plaintiff was informed that if he did not do so, his case would be dismissed without prejudice. All notices have been returned as undeliverable and Plaintiff has not provided the information as provided in the Courts 3/14/17 Notice, 1/17/18 scheduling order and 10/9/18 and 11/1/18 text orders. This case is dismissed without prejudice and closed. (RK, ilcd) |
||
Thursday, November 01, 2018 | ||
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 11/01 3:40 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 11/1/2018. On October 1, 2018, the Court learned that Plaintiff has been released from custody. It noted that Plaintiff had not provided his new address to the Clerk, despite the directions in the Courts March 14, 2017 Notice and January 17, 2018 scheduling order. On 10/9/2018, the Court gave Plaintiff 21 days in which to file a Notice of Address change with the Clerk, advising that if he did not comply, his case could be dismissed. The Clerk sent the Notice to Pontiac, Plaintiffs only address on record. The Notice has subsequently been returned as undeliverable. Plaintiff has not filed his updated contact information with the Court and will be given one final opportunity, within 14 days to do so. If he does not, this case will be dismissed without prejudice.(RK, ilcd) |
||
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 10/26 12:28 PM
10/9/2018 Text Order sent to Kenneth Powell B66010 at Pontiac Correctional Center has been returned as undeliverable: "PAROLED"(JS, ilcd) |
|
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 10/09 2:16 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 10/9/2018. On October 1, 2018, IDOC informed the Clerk that Plaintiff have been released from custody. Plaintiff had been informed, in the Courts March 14, 2017 Notice and, again, in the Court's January 17, 2018 scheduling order, that he was to keep the Clerk apprised as to his whereabouts. Plaintiff is hereby given 21 days in which to file a Notice of Address change with the Clerk. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this action.(JS, ilcd) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines (including Answer ddl)
Tue 10/09 2:18 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Change of Address to be filed by plaintiff by 10/30/2018 (JS, ilcd) |
||
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Letter
Thu 10/04 12:32 PM
Letter received from IDOC regarding release of Plaintiff Kenneth Powell with no forwarding address given. (JS, ilcd) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice Rule 56 entered
Mon 03/26 12:35 PM
RULE 56 NOTICE entered re18 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies . (JS, ilcd) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 03/26 11:45 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies by Defendants Donald Doolin, Susan Prentice, Trevor Wilson. Responses due by 4/16/2018(Williams, Alan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 03/21 3:37 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 3/21/2018. On February 26, 2018, the Court granted Defendants an extension in which to file a motion for summary judgment on the issue of exhaustion. Defendants now file17 a second motion for extension.17 is GRANTED. Defendants have until April 18, 2018 in which to file.(JS, ilcd) |
||
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 03/19 3:46 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File motion for summary judgment on the issue of exhaustion of administrative remedies by Defendants Donald Doolin, Susan Prentice, Trevor Wilson. Responses due by 4/2/2018 (Williams, Alan) |
|
Monday, March 05, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
HIPAA Order
Mon 03/05 4:03 PM
HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 3/5/2018. (JS, ilcd) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Protective Order
Mon 03/05 12:09 PM
MOTION for Protective Order (HIPAA Qualified Protective Order) by Defendants Donald Doolin, Susan Prentice, Trevor Wilson. Responses due by 3/19/2018(Williams, Alan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Mon 03/05 4:02 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 3/5/2018. Defendant has filed a Motion for Entry of a HIPAA Qualified Protective Order (Doc.15 ), which is hereby GRANTED as the Court finds that good cause exists to prevent the unauthorized disclosure and direct the use of protected health information during the course of this litigation. The Court, however, has its own standard HIPAA order, which will be entered in lieu of the proposed order. (JS, ilcd) |
||
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Order on Motion to Stay 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 02/26 4:12 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 2/26/2018: Defendants file14 a motion for extension in which to file a motion for summary judgment on the issue of exhaustion.14 is GRANTED as Defendants have until March 18, 2018, in which to file.(JRK, ilcd) |
||
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Document Stay
Fri 02/16 8:53 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File motion for summary judgment on the issue of exhaustion , MOTION to Stay discovery by Defendants Donald Doolin, Susan Prentice, Trevor Wilson. Responses due by 3/2/2018 (Williams, Alan) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Prisoner Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 01/17 11:22 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 1/17/2018. IT IS ORDERED: The parties are reminded of their option to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (See attached consent form). The Court recommends serious consideration of this option. Given this Court's heavy docket and full calendar of hearings and trials, consent to a U.S. Magistrate may result in a faster disposition and trial date than this Court can provide. Discovery closes August 20, 2018. Summary judgment motions are due September 20, 2018. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER.(JS, ilcd) Modified on 1/17/2018 (JS, ilcd) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Forms | ||
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 12/05 9:00 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 12/05/2017. Defendants' motion for extension in which to file an answer to the complaint11 is retroactively, GRANTED. Their subsequently filed answer12 , is allowed.(JS, ilcd) |
||
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 12/01 8:36 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Doolin, Susan Prentice, Trevor Wilson.(Williams, Alan) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 11/22 11:35 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Defendants Doolin, Susan Prentice, Trevor Wilson. Responses due by 12/6/2017 (Williams, Alan) |
|
Monday, October 09, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance of Attorney
Mon 10/09 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Alan Williams on behalf of Doolin, Susan Prentice, Trevor Wilson (Williams, Alan) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 10/04 1:31 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kenneth Powell. Doolin waiver sent on 9/25/2017, answer due 11/24/2017; Susan Prentice waiver sent on 9/25/2017, answer due 11/24/2017; Trevor Wilson waiver sent on 9/25/2017, answer due 11/24/2017. (JS, ilcd) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Request for Waiver of Service & Notice of Lawsuit
Mon 09/25 12:00 PM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Trevor Wilson, Doolin, Susan Prentice on 9/25/2017. (JS, ilcd) |
|
7 | 7
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Prisoner Merit Review Opinion ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Mon 09/25 11:53 AM
MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 9/25/2017. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: This case shall proceed solely on the federal claim(s) identified herein. Any claims not identified will not be included in the case, except in the Court's discretion upon motion by a party for good cause shown, or by leave of court pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. Defendant Andrew Tilden is DISMISSED. The Clerk is directed to send to each Defendant pursuant to this District's internal procedures: 1) a Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service; 2) a Waiver of Service; 3) a copy of the Complaint; and 4) a copy of this Order. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (JS, ilcd) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 07/10 1:23 PM
MOTION for Status by Plaintiff Kenneth Powell. Responses due by 7/24/2017 (JS, ilcd) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
misc
Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
Mon 04/24 3:36 PM
Prisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 4/21/2017, in the amount of $20.33; receipt number 14626029166 (JRK, ilcd) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Ledger
Tue 03/21 2:14 PM
+++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Kenneth Powell (JRK, ilcd) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/21 2:14 PM
PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Kenneth Powell.(JRK, ilcd) |
|
order
Order on Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/21 2:49 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 3/21/2017 granting4 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $20.33. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month`s income credited to Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff`s account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff`s place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. (JRK, ilcd) |
||
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Remark
Tue 03/14 3:05 PM
Remark: Blank Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees of Costs. (JS, ilcd) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Opening
Tue 03/14 3:02 PM
NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Joe Billy McDade. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division,100 NE Monroe Street,Peoria,IL 61602.Merit Review Deadline set for 4/3/2017.(JS, ilcd) |
|
Att: 1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/14 3:00 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kenneth Powell.(JS, ilcd) |
|
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 03/14 3:04 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 3/14/2017. Plaintiff has filed a Complaint but has not paid the $400 filing fee nor filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 21 days of the entry of this order, Plaintiff must pay the $400 filing fee in full or file a petition to proceed in forma pauperis with attached trust fund ledgers for the last 6 months. Failure to comply without good cause will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice, and the Plaintiff will still be responsible for payment of the filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1914. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis.(JS, ilcd) |