Deterding v. Ellis et al
Iowa Southern District Court | |
Judge: | John A Jarvey |
Referred: | Stephen B Jackson, Jr |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00097 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 07, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 04/20 2:42 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Dustin Michael Deterding which included3 Initial Review Order. Was addressed to Polk County Jail (don, ) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Thu 04/13 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Dustin Michael Deterding current address is IMCC (don, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 04/12 12:34 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Dustin Michael Deterding which included4 Judgment (don, ) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 04/10 1:01 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. which included4 Judgment,3 Initial Review Order. Updated address to IMCC and resent entries3 and4 to the plaintiff. (don, ) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judgment
Fri 04/07 9:39 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of Andrew Gilbert, Dave Ellis, David Rodish, Erick Twombly against Dustin Michael Deterding. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 4/7/2017. (don, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Initial Review Order
Tue 04/04 4:11 PM
INITIAL REVIEW ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 4/4/2017. (mem) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/14 10:22 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dustin Michael Deterding. (cc) |
|
Att: 1 cert of account, | ||
Att: 2 app without fees | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/14 10:15 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dustin Michael Deterding. (cc) |