United States of America v. Halsten et al
Iowa Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert W Pratt |
Referred: | Celeste F Bremer |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00098 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1345 Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 4:09 AM CDT |
Defendant
City of Altoona
|
|
Defendant
Guaranty Residential Lending, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sandy L Halsten
|
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Satisfaction of Judgment
Fri 06/29 9:52 AM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered In favor of United States of America Against Sandy L Halsten by United States of America. (Purdy, William) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Marshals Sale
Tue 04/03 10:48 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Confirm Marshal's Sale. Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 4/3/2018. (dy) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Confirm Marshal Sale
Fri 03/02 10:54 AM
MOTION to Confirm Marshal's Sale by United States of America. Responses due by 3/16/2018. If service was made under FRCP 5(b)(2)(C) (mail), (D) (leaving with the clerk of court), or (F) (by delivering by other means consented to in writing), an additional three days is added after the period would otherwise expire under FRCP 6(a). The additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Scherle, Rachel) |
|
Att: 1 Order | ||
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 02/20 4:29 PM
Marshall Return by United States of America. (krn) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment and Decree of Foreclosure
Wed 12/06 2:56 PM
JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE in favor of Plaintiff in Rem against the mortgaged premises, U.S. Marshal to sell the property.. Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 12/6/2017. (krn) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Proposed Decree
Thu 11/30 9:25 AM
PROPOSED DECREE by United States of America.(Scherle, Rachel) |
|
Att: 1 Decree, | ||
Att: 2 Consent | ||
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Wed 11/29 4:00 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Sandy L. Halsten. (sjc) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Default Entry by Clerk
Mon 11/27 1:33 PM
MOTION for Default Entry in re City of Altoona, Guaranty Residential Lending, Inc., Sandy L Halsten by United States of America. Responses due by 12/11/2017. If service was made under FRCP 5(b)(2)(C) (mail), (D) (leaving with the clerk of court), or (F) (by delivering by other means consented to in writing), an additional three days is added after the period would otherwise expire under FRCP 6(a). The additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Scherle, Rachel) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Default | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Consent
Mon 11/27 12:05 PM
NOTICE of Consent(s) by United States of America(Scherle, Rachel) |
|
Att: 1 Consent | ||
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Affidavit
Tue 06/27 11:42 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Guaranty Residential Lending Secretary of State filing by United States of America.(Scherle, Rachel) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment 1, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment 2 | ||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 06/19 3:39 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States of America; City of Altoona waiver served on 3/15/2017, answer due 5/15/2017. (Scherle, Rachel) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 04/06 10:41 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States of America; Sandy L Halsten waiver served on 3/15/2017, answer due 5/15/2017. (Scherle, Rachel) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/14 1:57 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 6/12/2017. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/13/2017.(Scherle, Rachel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B |